EP2443452 - PREDICTIVE EVALUATION OF THE RESPONSE TO TAXANE-INCLUDING CHEMOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Università Cattolica del Sacro Cuore Largo Agostino Gemelli 1 20123 Milano MI / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Universita' Cattolica Del Sacro Cuore Largo Agostino Gemelli 1 20123 Milano Mi / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCAMBIA, Giovanni Via della Camilluccia 741 I-00135 Roma RM / IT | 02 /
FERRANDINA, Maria, Gabriella Via Tommaso Pendola 12 I-00168 Roma RM / IT | 03 /
FERLINI, Cristiano Via Michelangelo Grigoletti 21 I-00125 Roma RM / IT | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Predazzi, Valentina Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Predazzi, Valentina Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09779795.5 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009EP57461 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010145693 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443452 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | PRÄDIKTIVE BEURTEILUNG DES ANSPRECHENS AUF EINE CHEMOTHERAPIE MIT TAXAN | [2012/17] | English: | PREDICTIVE EVALUATION OF THE RESPONSE TO TAXANE-INCLUDING CHEMOTHERAPY | [2012/17] | French: | EVALUATION PRÉDICTIVE DE LA RÉPONSE À UNE CHIMIOTHÉRAPIE UTILISANT UN TAXANE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 06.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2006076100 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 1-13 * claims 1, 10, 23, 29 *; | [Y] - DUMONTET CHARLES ET AL, "Ixabepilone: targeting betaIII-tubulin expression in taxane-resistant malignancies.", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS JAN 2009, (200901), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 17 - 25, XP002551229 [Y] 1-13 * page 18, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-08-0986 | [ID] - BHATTACHARYA RAJAT ET AL, "A ubiquitous beta-tubulin disrupts microtubule assembly and inhibits cell proliferation.", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL JUL 2004, (200407), vol. 15, no. 7, ISSN 1059-1524, pages 3123 - 3131, XP002551230 [ID] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3129, column r, paragraph l * * page 3124, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 3130, column l, paragraph f * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1091/mbc.E04-01-0060 | [Y] - OKUDA KATSUHIRO ET AL, "Expression of excision repair cross-complementation group 1 and class III beta-tubulin predict survival after chemotherapy for completely resected non-small cell lung cancer.", LUNG CANCER (AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS) OCT 2008, (200810), vol. 62, no. 1, ISSN 0169-5002, pages 105 - 112, XP025467363 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 106, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lungcan.2008.02.021 |