EP2297830 - HIGH-SPEED CIRCUIT BREAKER FOR A HIGH-PERFORMANCE BATTERY IN AN ISOLATED DIRECT CURRENT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHLF, Gerd Langenlohe 8 91369 Wiesenthau / DE | 02 /
RISIUS, Oskar Kunigundenstr. 31 91056 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
SCHULDT, Andreas Poppenwind 10 91350 Gremsdorf / DE | 04 /
TÖLLE, Hans-Jürgen Kleinweidenmühle 9 90419 Nürnberg / DE | 05 /
MARX, Walter Spessartstrasse 34 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [2011/12] | Application number, filing date | 09779964.7 | 26.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009EP58032 | Priority number, date | DE20081032222 | 09.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008032222 | DE20081053074 | 24.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008053074 | [2011/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010003835 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2297830 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2297830 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/26, B63G8/08 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
H02H7/268 (EP);
H02J1/10 (KR);
B63G8/08 (EP,KR);
H02H7/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHNELLSCHALTEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HOCHLEISTUNGS-BATTERIE IN EINEM GLEICHSTROMINSELNETZ | [2011/12] | English: | HIGH-SPEED CIRCUIT BREAKER FOR A HIGH-PERFORMANCE BATTERY IN AN ISOLATED DIRECT CURRENT NETWORK | [2011/12] | French: | DISJONCTEUR RAPIDE POUR UNE BATTERIE HAUTE PUISSANCE DANS UN RÉSEAU AUTONOME DE COURANT CONTINU | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2009 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | AT | 26.06.2018 | IE | 26.06.2018 | LU | 26.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.06.2009 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 26.06.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
AT | 26.06.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.06.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2008055493 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,4 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1918192 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT [DE]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 1 * |