EP2310549 - COATING SYSTEM, COATED WORKPIECE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Surface Solutions Ltd., Pfäffikon Churerstrasse 120 8808 Pfäffikon SZ / CH | [2017/48] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 9477 Trübbach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECHTHALER, Markus Am breiten Wasen 1 A-6800 Feldkirch / AT | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2017/49] |
Former [2011/16] | Troesch, Jacques J. Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 09780142.7 | 03.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP58423 | Priority number, date | US20080079230P | 09.07.2008 Original published format: US 79230 P | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010003902 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310549 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310549 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/00, C23C14/06, C23C28/04 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C23C14/0036 (EP,US);
C23C14/06 (KR);
C23C14/0641 (EP,US);
C23C14/0647 (EP,US);
C23C14/0658 (EP,US);
C23C14/0664 (EP,US);
C23C14/067 (EP,US);
C23C14/0676 (EP,US);
C23C14/0688 (EP,US);
C23C14/16 (KR);
C23C14/32 (KR);
C23C14/34 (KR);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEM, BESCHICHTETES WERKSTÜCK UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/16] | English: | COATING SYSTEM, COATED WORKPIECE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2011/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT, PIÈCE REVÊTUE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/24] |
Former [2011/16] | SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT, PIÈCE ENDUITE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 08.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2017 | 26.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | IE | 03.07.2018 | MT | 03.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | DK | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | DK | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | DK | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | DK | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | DK | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | EE | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | HR | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | HR | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | LT | 06.12.2017 | |
NO | 06.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006084404 (UNAXIS BALZERS AG [LI], et al) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2006005217 (UNAXIS BALZERS AG [LI], et al) [I] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2008037556 (OERLIKON TRADING AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-25 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2129809 | CN104441828 |