EP2331379 - ROPEWAY SYSTEM, METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH A SYSTEM, AND ROPEWAY SYSTEM SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolic Invest S.AR.L. 41, Boulevard Prince Henri 1724 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESER, Hartmut Jaufental 1M I-39040 Racines / IT | 02 /
OBEXER, Stephan Via Weisskirche 24[deg] I-39030 Vandoies Di Sopra / IT | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Eccetto, Mauro, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/24] | Eccetto, Mauro, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09781329.9 | 31.07.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP59921 | Priority number, date | IT2008MI01435 | 31.07.2008 Original published format: IT MI20081435 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010012819 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331379 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331379 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B61B7/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B61B7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | SEILBAHNANLAGE, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB SOLCH EINER ANLAGE UND SCHALTVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SEILBAHNANLAGE | [2011/24] | English: | ROPEWAY SYSTEM, METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH A SYSTEM, AND ROPEWAY SYSTEM SWITCHING DEVICE | [2011/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉPHÉRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION POUR SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉPHÉRIQUE | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 26.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2009 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | GR | 21.03.2012 | HR | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MK | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | SM | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | NO | 21.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | IE | 31.07.2012 | LU | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 31.07.2009 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
SM | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 31.07.2012 | ||
LU | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
SM | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 31.07.2012 | ||
LU | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
NO | 21.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR913146 (SCHWENDER) [A] 1,13 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1174323 (INNOVA PATENT GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,13 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1927523 (INNOVA PATENT GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,13 * figures 6-8 *; | [AP]EP1972520 (INNOVA PATENT GMBH [AT]) [AP] 15* figure 1 * |