EP2313805 - POSITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITK Dr. Kassen GmbH Beim Eberacker 3 35633 Lahnau / DE | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASSEN, Folkert Am Flurscheid 7 35633 Lahnau-Atzbach / DE | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Peter Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 DE-35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Schubert, Peter advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 DE-35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09781788.6 | 13.08.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009EP60480 | Priority number, date | DE20081037876 | 15.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008037876 | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010018206 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313805 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/26 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
G02B21/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | POSITIONIERSYSTEM | [2011/17] | English: | POSITIONING SYSTEM | [2011/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/23] | 30.04.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.05.2014 | 05.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2005265996 (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1,4-5,13-16 * abstract * [I] 2-3,6-12; | [XI]JPH0627387 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,4-5,13-16 * abstract * [I] 2-3,6-12; | [XI]EP1879063 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-5,13-16 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021] * [I] 2-3,6-12; | [A]WO0004304 (NANOMOTION INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 14, line 19 - page 16, line 16 *; | [A]EP0628789 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 7, line 44 - line 46 * | Examination | US2006092047 | JPH03202714 | - Michael Schwabe, "Position magnetisch oder photoelektrisch erfassen?", A&D NEWLETTER, (20030401), pages 22 - 26, XP055082158 |