EP2318585 - MULTIPLE STEP DYEING TEXTILE WITH CONCENTRATED DYE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Colours Distribution GmbH Industriepark Höchst, Gebäude B 598 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states DyStar Colours Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Christian Venloer Strasse 8 41751 Viersen / DE | 02 /
SCHROTT, Wolfgang Otto-Stabel-Strasse 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
SÜTSCH, Franz Hauptstrasse 159 67127 Rödersheim-Gronau / DE | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/19] | Muley, Ralf DyStar Colours Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Industriepark Höchst / Geb. B598 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09781832.2 | 14.08.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009EP60528 | Priority number, date | DE20081039500 | 23.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008039500 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010023113 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2318585 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/00 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
D06P1/0016 (EP,US);
D06B1/02 (EP,US);
D06B3/04 (EP,US);
D06B5/06 (EP,US);
D06P1/002 (EP,US);
D06P1/0044 (EP,US);
D06P1/0096 (EP,US);
D06P1/228 (EP,US);
D06P1/30 (EP,US);
D06P1/965 (EP,US);
D06P3/003 (EP,US);
D06P3/6025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | IN MEHREREN SCHRITTEN GEFÄRBTER TEXTILSTOFF MIT KONZENTRIERTEN FÄRBESYSTEMEN | [2011/19] | English: | MULTIPLE STEP DYEING TEXTILE WITH CONCENTRATED DYE SYSTEMS | [2011/19] | French: | TEINTURE TEXTILE MULTI ÉTAPES AVEC DES SYSTÈMES CONCENTRÉS | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 30.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2012 | Request for further processing for: | 30.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6090166 (GIRBAUD FRANCOIS [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - line 3; figures 1-5 * * line 1 - column 4, line 35 *; | [Y]US6428581 (GAENG MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 1 - line 15 * * column 2, line 35 - line 67 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 2; examples 2-4 * * claim 8 *; | [A]WO2007080134 (MASTER S A S DI RONCHI FRANCES [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 19, line 18 - page 20, line 10 ** page 21, line 18 - page 22, line 6 *; | [IY]WO2008056256 (MASTER SRL [IT], et al) [I] 1-4,6-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 4; figure 1 * * page 12, line 1 - line 15 * * page 13, line 10 - page 14, line 13 * * page 15, line 14 - page 17, line 3 * * page 17, line 19 - line 24 * * page 18, line 17 - page 19, line 2 * * page 19, line 17 - line 24 * * page 21, line 10 - line 23 * * page 22, line 18 - page 23, line 3 * [Y] 5 |