EP2327157 - LEVEL SHIFTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROENEWEG, Willem Eggenwilerstrasse 44a CH-5620 Bremgarten / CH | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Zapalowicz, Francis Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09782805.7 | 09.09.2009 | [2011/22] | WO2009EP61675 | Priority number, date | EP20080105304 | 11.09.2008 Original published format: EP 08105304 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029098 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327157 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/356, H03K5/08, H03K17/22, G06F1/26, G06F1/28, H03F3/45 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
H03K3/356113 (EP,US);
H03F3/45179 (EP,US);
H03K17/223 (EP,US);
H03K5/08 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45358 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | PEGELUMSETZER | [2011/22] | English: | LEVEL SHIFTER | [2011/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉTABLISSEMENT DU NIVEAU ZÉRO | [2011/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 25.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005248381 (KUBOTA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 5-8 * [Y] 4-8; | [A]US5245223 (LIM PETER N C [SG], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2002175737 (DEBATY PASCAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * | [Y] - TOMISAWA J ET AL, "Low-current consumption CMOS comparator using charge-storage amplifier for A/D converters", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2008. ISCAS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080518), ISBN 978-1-4244-1683-7, pages 1942 - 1945, XP031392379 [Y] 4-8 * figure 2 * |