EP2342152 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MODERNIZING AN ELEVATOR INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDLI, Paul Lindenweg 2 CH-5453 Remetschwil / CH | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Hirschberger, Petra Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2011/28] | Hirschberger, Petra Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Application number, filing date | 09783009.5 | 15.09.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009EP61916 | Priority number, date | WO2008EP62303 | 16.09.2008 Original published format: PCT/EP2008/062303 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031753 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342152 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2342152 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/18 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
B66B1/2458 (EP,US);
B66B1/18 (KR);
B66B1/34 (KR);
B66B1/3446 (US);
B66B19/007 (EP,US);
B66B2201/102 (EP,US);
B66B2201/103 (EP,US);
B66B2201/211 (EP,US);
B66B2201/214 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2011/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MODERNISIERUNG EINER AUFZUGSANLAGE | [2011/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MODERNIZING AN ELEVATOR INSTALLATION | [2011/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MODERNISER UNE INSTALLATION D'ASCENSEUR | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE TK Elevator Innovation and Operations GmbH Thyssenkrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Paustian & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE thyssenkrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Jacobi, Nicolas TK Elevator GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1-Q5 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2018/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE thyssenkrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2016/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative ThyssenKrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | 17.06.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2022 | 04.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 15.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0421/24 | 15.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 16.05.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.04.2018 | Appeal received No. T1027/18 | 23.04.2018 | Payment of appeal fee | 09.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2009 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | MT | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | IE | 15.09.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | AT | 15.09.2022 | LU | 15.09.2022 | PL | 15.09.2022 | NL | 01.10.2022 | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/35] | HU | 15.09.2009 | |
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
AT | 15.09.2022 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
NL | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 15.09.2009 | |
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.09.2022 | ||
NL | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.09.2009 | |
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.09.2009 | |
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.09.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | HR | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003116384 (FRIEDLI PAUL [CH]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0007] , [0039] , [0053] , [0071]; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]EP1935824 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [AD] 1,15* paragraph [0030]; figures 8-10 * | Examination | EP2288562 | US2011120814 | by applicant | EP1935824 | Opposition | EP1319625 | WO2004106211 | EP1900672 | EP1935824 | WO2009132697 | EP2288562 |