EP2331475 - HIGH-REFLECTION GLAZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/24] | HIGH REFLECTION GLAZING | ||
[2017/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2014/18] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTER, Dominique Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 02 /
DI STEFANO, Gaëtan Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 03 /
DUSOULIER, Laurent Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre Intellectual Property Department Rue Louis Blériot 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | ||
Former [2011/24] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de l'Aurore 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 09783110.1 | 17.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP62043 | Priority number, date | EP20080164513 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: EP 08164513 | [2011/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031808 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331475 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331475 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/245, C03C17/34 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
C03C17/2456 (EP,US);
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C03C2217/212 (EP,US);
C03C2217/214 (EP,US);
C03C2217/219 (EP,US);
C03C2217/22 (EP,US);
C03C2217/23 (EP,US);
C03C2217/24 (EP,US);
C03C2218/154 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERGLASUNG MIT ERHÖHTER REFLEXION | [2017/31] | English: | HIGH-REFLECTION GLAZING | [2017/31] | French: | VITRAGE À RÉFLEXION ÉLEVÉE | [2017/31] |
Former [2011/24] | HOCHREFELKTIRERENDE VERGLASUNG | ||
Former [2011/24] | HIGH REFLECTION GLAZING | ||
Former [2011/24] | VITRAGE A REFLEXION ELEVEE | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2019
21.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [2020/26] |
Former [2019/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2019
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR Opponent's representative Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | 04.03.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.06.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.05.2020 | 28.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 14.10.2021 | Appeal received No. T1841/21 | 14.10.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 16.12.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 01.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | MT | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | IE | 17.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | GB | 17.09.2022 | LU | 17.09.2022 | RO | 17.09.2022 | ES | 18.09.2022 | HU | 18.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/47] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GB | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
RO | 17.09.2022 | ||
HU | 18.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
RO | 17.09.2022 | ||
HU | 18.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
RO | 17.09.2022 | ||
HU | 18.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
RO | 17.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
RO | 17.09.2022 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0012304 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract ** claims 1-4 *; | [X]FR2793889 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 8, line 12 - line 26 * * examples 1-4 *; | [X]EP1068899 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * table 1 * * table 3 *; | [X]EP1211524 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * table 1 *; | [A]WO2007010462 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [X]US2007184291 (HARRIS CAROLINE S [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * table 8 *; | [X] - BURDIS M S, "Properties of sputtered thin films of vanadium-titanium oxide for use in electrochromic windows", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19971231), vol. 311, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 286 - 298, XP004121356 [X] 1-4,6-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(97)00724-4 | [X] - MOTOV O A ET AL, "PROPERTIES OF THIN LAYERS OF MIXTURES OF TITANIUM, NIOBIUM AND ZIRCONIUM OXIDES, OBTAINED BY CATHODE SPUTTERING", OPTIKO MEHANICESKAA PROMYSLENNOST, LENINGRAD, RU, (19780101), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0030-4042, pages 47 - 49, XP008023034 [X] 1-18 * examples 2,3; table 2 * | Opposition | US4940636 | US5110637 | US2002012779 | FR2814094 | WO2009115596 | - P.J. KELLYA et al., "A comparison of the properties of titanium-based films produced by pulsed and continuous DC magnetron sputtering", Surface and Coatings Technology, (20030000), vol. 174 -175, pages 795 - 800, XP055563951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(03)00356-6 |