EP2347588 - TIMESTAMPING A DATA STREAM IN A SINGLE FREQUENCY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDF 106, avenue Marx Dormoy 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPAIN, Pascal 9 Allée des Ajoncs F-35131 Pont Pean / FR | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Le Noane, Karine Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet P.O.Box 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Le Noane, Karine Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2011/30] | Le Noane, Karine Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09783571.4 | 29.09.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009EP62646 | Priority number, date | FR20080057099 | 17.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0857099 | [2011/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043498 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347588 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347588 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/234, H04N21/236, H04N21/44, H04N21/8547, H04H20/10, H04H20/18, H04H20/67 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
H04N21/44016 (EP);
H04H20/103 (EP);
H04H20/18 (EP);
H04H20/67 (EP);
H04N21/23424 (EP);
H04N21/23608 (EP);
H04N21/8547 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | H04N7/24, H04H20/18, H04H20/10, H04H20/67 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | ZEITSTEMPELN EINES DATENSTROMS IN EINEM EINFREQUENZNETZ | [2011/30] | English: | TIMESTAMPING A DATA STREAM IN A SINGLE FREQUENCY NETWORK | [2011/30] | French: | HORODATAGE D' UN FLUX DE DONNEES DANS UN RESEAU A FREQUENCE UNIQUE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 08.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2009 | AT | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MK | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | SM | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IE | 29.09.2012 | LU | 29.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 29.09.2009 | |
AT | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
SM | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
LU | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
SM | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
LU | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2902591 (TDF SA [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * page 14, line 5 - page 17, line 8 * * page 22, line 15 - line 17 *; | [A]WO2007050217 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]; ELSTERMANN ERIK [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |