EP2343986 - READY-TO-USE, STABLE EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/16] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖPSEL, Christian Kriemhildstr. 26 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 09783652.2 | 01.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009EP62768 | Priority number, date | EP20080165989 | 07.10.2008 Original published format: EP 08165989 | [2011/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010040683 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343986 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343986 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2343986 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/38, A23D7/01, A61K8/31, A61K8/67, A61K8/73, A61Q19/00, A23L1/30, A23L2/52, A23K1/16, A61K8/34, A61K8/06, A23L1/302, A23D7/005 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
A23D7/0053 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (US);
A23D7/011 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A23L2/38 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A61K31/015 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/67 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
A61K2800/10 (US);
A61K2800/21 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | A23D7/005, A23K1/16, A23L1/30, A23L1/302, A23L2/52, A23L2/58, A61K8/06, A61K9/107 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEBRAUCHFERTIGE, STABILE EMULSION | [2011/29] | English: | READY-TO-USE, STABLE EMULSION | [2011/29] | French: | ÉMULSION STABLE PRÊTE À L'EMPLOI | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 24.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2016/46] | 10.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.11.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.03.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.07.2019 | Appeal received No. T1930/19 | 13.09.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.11.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2009 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | AT | 01.10.2016 | IE | 01.10.2016 | LU | 01.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.10.2009 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
AT | 01.10.2016 | ||
IE | 01.10.2016 | ||
LU | 01.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.10.2009 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
AT | 01.10.2016 | ||
IE | 01.10.2016 | ||
LU | 01.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
AT | 01.10.2016 | ||
IE | 01.10.2016 | ||
LU | 01.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 01.10.2016 | ||
LU | 01.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 01.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YX]EP0551638 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 57; examples 1-4 * [X] 1-15; | [A]WO2007009601 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [A]EP1875814 (SENSIENT FOOD COLORS GERMANY G [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1927287 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [XAY]WO2008087140 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,12-15 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; example 1 * [A] 3,4,8 [Y] 11 | Opposition | EP0835613 | EP0845503 | WO2005075066 | WO2007003543 | WO2007009601 | EP1782803 | EP1875814 | WO2008087140 | WO2010112406 | - Belitz, H.-D., Grosch, W., "Lehrbuch der Lebensmittelchemie. 3 Auflage.", Springer Verlag, Berlin, (19870000), pages 1 - 6 | - Research Disclosure 452 072 | - Product Data Sheet Purity Gum, 27.07.2000 |