EP2342449 - INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONAS, Stephan Mühlweg 1 93098 Mintraching / DE | [2011/28] | Application number, filing date | 09784033.4 | 15.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009EP63496 | Priority number, date | DE20081051931 | 16.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008051931 | [2011/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043678 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342449 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/02 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
F02M63/0265 (EP,US);
F02M63/0225 (EP,US);
F02M63/027 (EP,US);
F02M63/0295 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | EINSPRITZANLAGE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2011/28] | English: | INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2011/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 28.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2013 | Request for further processing for: | 28.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0517991 (MARTIN TIBY M [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 10, line 49 - column 12, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH0571439 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1,3-4 * abstract *; | [X]DE102004055219 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1612402 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1-4* paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE102007059731 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,3-4 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] - [0028]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | DE717647 | EP0590362 | DE19829306 |