EP2342128 - NACELLE COMPRISING A STRUT DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AN AIRCRAFT TURBOJET ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/28] | STRUT DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AN AIRCRAFT TURBOJET ENGINE, AND NACELLE COMPRISING SUCH A STRUT | ||
[2013/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aircelle Route du Pont 8 76700 Gonfreville l'Orcher / FR | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUEL, Pierre 86 rue Gabriel Péri F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
VAUCHEL, Guy, Bernard 6 allée du Pont Durand F-76600 Le Havre / FR | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Gaillarde, Frédéric F. Ch. Cabinet Germain & Maureau 31-33, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Gaillarde, Frédéric F. Ch. Cabinet GERMAIN ET MAUREAU 8 avenue du Président Wilson 75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/28] | Gaillarde, Frédéric F. Ch. Cabinet GERMAIN ET MAUREAU 8 avenue du Président Wilson 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09784333.8 | 05.08.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009FR00981 | Priority number, date | FR20080005420 | 01.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0805420 | FR20090001071 | 09.03.2009 Original published format: FR 0901071 | [2011/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010037917 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342128 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2342128 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/26, B64D29/06 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
B64D27/40 (EP,US);
B64D29/08 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
F05D2260/50 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GONDEL UMFASSEND EINE ZUR ABSTÜTZUNG EINES FLUGZEUGTURBOSTRAHLTRIEBWERKS AUSGEFÜHRTE STREBE | [2013/47] | English: | NACELLE COMPRISING A STRUT DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AN AIRCRAFT TURBOJET ENGINE | [2013/47] | French: | NACELLE COMPRENANT UN MÂT ADAPTÉ POUR SUPPORTER UN TURBORÉACTEUR D'AÉRONEF | [2013/47] |
Former [2011/28] | ZUR ABSTÜTZUNG EINES FLUGZEUGTURBOSTRAHLTRIEBWERKS AUSGEFÜHRTE STREBE UND EINE SOLCHE STREBE UMFASSENDE GONDEL | ||
Former [2011/28] | STRUT DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AN AIRCRAFT TURBOJET ENGINE, AND NACELLE COMPRISING SUCH A STRUT | ||
Former [2011/28] | MÂT ADAPTÉ POUR SUPPORTER UN TURBORÉACTEUR D'AÉRONEF, ET NACELLE COMPRENANT UN TEL MÂT | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 30.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Request for further processing for: | 09.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2009 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | IE | 05.08.2014 | LU | 05.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4044973 (MOOREHEAD JAMES R); | [A]FR2732947 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]); | [XAI]FR2873987 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]); | [XAI]FR2891526 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]); | [XAI]WO2008043903 (AIRCELLE SA [FR], et al) |