EP2313635 - THRUSTER COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF ROCKET MOTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snecma 2 Bld du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/16] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Snecma 2 Bld du General Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRARDY, Jean-Marie 46 rue de l'Abbaye du Beau Bec F-27940 Courcelles Sur Seine / FR | 02 /
PEYRISSE, Daniel 5 rue de Parisis Les Parzy 27950 Saint Marcel / FR | [2013/52] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
CONRARDY, Jean-Marie 46 rue de l'Abbaye du Beau Bec F-27940 Courcelles Sur Seine / FR | ||
02 /
PEYRISSE, Daniel 5 rue de Parisis Les Parzy 27950 Saint Marcel / FR | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2011/17] | Barbin le Bourhis, Joël, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09784511.9 | 10.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009FR51389 | Priority number, date | FR20080054770 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: FR 0854770 | [2011/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010004232 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313635 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313635 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/60, F02K9/64, F02K7/18 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
F02K9/60 (EP,US);
F02K7/18 (EP,US);
F02K9/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | TRIEBWERK MIT MEHREREN RAKETENMOTOREN | [2011/17] | English: | THRUSTER COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF ROCKET MOTORS | [2011/17] | French: | RÉACTEUR COMPORTANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE MOTEURS-FUSÉES | [2013/52] |
Former [2011/17] | REACTEUR COMPORTANT UNE PLURALITE DE MOTEURS-FUSEES | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2009 | AT | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MK | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | SM | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | IE | 10.07.2014 | LU | 10.07.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | GB | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
TR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GB | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 10.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1342905 (EADS LAUNCH VEHICLES [FR]; MBDA FRANCE [FR] EADS SPACE TRANSP SAS [FR]) [Y] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] - [0036]; figure 1 * [A] 7; | [YA]GB2196393 (GEN ELECTRIC GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-6,8 * page 7, lines 25-60 - page 8, lines 1-10; figure 4 * [A] 7; | [A]DE1025681 (SNECMA) [A] 1,2 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0604279 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [A] 3-6,8 * column 6, lines 124-51; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0571254 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [A] 3-6,8 * abstract * | [Y] - DAINES R ET AL, "COMBINED ROCKET AND AIRBREATHING PROPULSION SYSTEMS FOR SPACE- LAUNCH APPLICATIONS", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK, US, (19980901), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0748-4658, pages 605 - 612, XP000778441 [Y] 1-6,8 * figure 4 * | [Y] - SCOTT W B, "AEROJET TESTS SHOW STRUTJET READY TO FLY", AVIATION WEEK AND SPACE TECHNOLOGY, MCGRAW-HILL COMPAGNY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990705), vol. 151, no. 1, ISSN 0005-2175, pages 57 - 60, XP000880803 [Y] 1-6,8 * page 60 * |