EP2342177 - NOVEL POTASSIUM CHANNEL BLOCKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2016/02] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHN, Derek, Edward Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | 02 /
MULLA, Mushtaq Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | 03 /
HAMLYN, Richard, John Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | 04 /
GARRETT, Sasha, Louise Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | 05 /
HARTZOULAKIS, Basil Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | 06 /
MADGE, David Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | 07 /
FORD, John Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | [2015/33] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
JOHN, Derek, Edward Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | ||
02 /
MULLA, Mushtaq Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | |||
03 /
HAMLYN, Richard, John Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | |||
04 /
GARRETT, Sarah, Louise Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | |||
05 /
HARTZOULAKIS, Basil Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | |||
06 /
MADGE, David Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | |||
07 /
FORD, John Xention Limited Iconix Park London Road Pampisford Cambridgeshire CB22 3EG / GB | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2011/28] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785012.7 | 27.08.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009GB02078 | Priority number, date | GB20080015782 | 29.08.2008 Original published format: GB 0815782 | US20080093233P | 29.08.2008 Original published format: US 93233 P | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010023448 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342177 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2342177 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/21, C07D207/12, C07D209/08, C07D211/08, C07D213/04, C07D231/00, C07D233/54, C07D265/30, C07D265/36, C07D271/08, C07D277/32, C07D285/135, C07D307/79, C07D311/70, C07D317/62, C07D319/18, C07D401/12, C07D413/12, A61K31/18, A61P29/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07C311/46 (EP,US);
C07C317/32 (US);
C07C317/40 (US);
C07D207/12 (EP,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D211/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/34 (EP,US);
C07D211/44 (EP,US);
C07D213/36 (EP,US);
C07D213/40 (EP,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D231/18 (EP,US);
C07D231/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/61 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D265/30 (EP,US);
C07D265/36 (EP,US);
C07D271/08 (EP,US);
C07D277/28 (EP,US);
C07D277/36 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,US);
C07D285/12 (EP,US);
C07D285/135 (EP,US);
C07D307/79 (EP,US);
C07D311/70 (EP,US);
C07D317/62 (EP,US);
C07D319/18 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | C07C311/21, C07D205/04, C07D211/08, C07D213/04, C07D231/00, C07D233/54, C07D265/28, C07D271/12, C07D277/32, C07D307/79, C07D311/70, C07D317/62, C07D319/18, A61K31/18, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2011/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE KALIUMKANALBLOCKER | [2011/28] | English: | NOVEL POTASSIUM CHANNEL BLOCKERS | [2011/28] | French: | NOUVEAUX BLOQUANTS DU CANAL POTASSIQUE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2009 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | IE | 27.08.2017 | LU | 27.08.2017 | MT | 27.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.08.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.08.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.08.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.08.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006183768 (FORD JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1, 7, 12, 14 *; | [A]US2002006929 (GROSS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1, 5, 7, 11, 13-15 *; | [X]US2004077696 (BORZILLERI ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7-9,13-22 * paragraphs [0086] , [0103]; example 9 *; | [X]US5721255 (HOWARD HARRY R [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8-9,13-18,20-21 * column 12, lines 42-63; example 57; claim 12 *; | [X]WO2007110171 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-2,4-10,13-14 * examples 20,21; claims 1,5 *; | [X]US2006258728 (TANI KOUSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-2,6,8-9,13-14 * example 6(270); claims 1, 10, 16; compound 791 *; | [X]US2006116410 (BANNER DAVID W [CH], et al) [X] 1-2,6,8-9,13-14 * examples 140, 141, 151-157, 159, 162, 163, 171, 172; claims 1, 45 *; | [X]WO2005030709 (LG LIFE SCIENCES LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-2,6-9,13-14 * claims 1, 6, 12; compound 9; * * preparation examples 43, 44 * | [AD] - HANSON DOUGLAS C ET AL, "UK-78,282, a novel piperidine compound that potently blocks the Kv1.3 voltage-gated potassium channel and inhibits human T cell activation", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, (19990101), vol. 126, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1707 - 1716, XP008091174 [AD] 1-22 * page 1709, column r - page 1710, column r; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0702480 |