EP2367816 - ISATIN DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS IN VIVO IMAGING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Innovations Limited Electrical and Electronic Engineering Building Level 12, Imperial College London Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | For all designated states Hammersmith Imanet Limited Cyclotron Building Hammersmith Hospital Du Cane Road London W12 0NN / GB | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOAGYE, Eric, Ofori 89 Severn Drive Enfield Middlesex EN1 4LY / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Graham 23 Paveley Court 30 Langstone Way Mill Hill London NW7 1GR / GB | 03 /
NGUYEN, Quang-Dé 158 Ladbroke Grove London W10 5NA / GB | 04 /
ARSTAD, Erik 15 Caird Street London W10 4RP / GB | 05 /
GLASER, Matthias, Eberhard 29 Eldon Road London N22 5DX / GB | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Venner, Julia Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Venner, Julia Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/39] | Venner, Julia Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785058.0 | 04.09.2009 | [2016/45] | WO2009GB02132 | Priority number, date | GB20080016294 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0816294 | GB20080018076 | 02.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0818076 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010026388 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2367816 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2367816 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D403/14, C07D405/14, A61K31/404, A61K51/00, A61P25/28 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61K51/04 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISATIN DERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS IN VIVO ABBILDUNGSMITTEL | [2015/22] | English: | ISATIN DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS IN VIVO IMAGING AGENTS | [2011/39] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ISATINE POUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENTS D'IMAGERIE IN VIVO | [2011/39] |
Former [2011/39] | SATINDERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS MITTEL FÜR DIER DIE IN-VIVO-BILDDARSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2009 | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DYA]WO2006074799 (UNIVERSITAETSKLINIKUM MUENSTER [DE], et al) [DY] 1-6,8-11,15-36 * page 1 - page 3; example -; claim - * [A] 7,12-14,37-40; | [YA] - D. ZHOU ET. AL., "Synthesis, radiolabeling, and in vivo evaluation of an 18F labeled isatin analog for imaging caspase-3 activation in apoptosis.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2006), vol. 16, pages 5041 - 5046, XP025107212 [Y] 1-6,8-11,15-36 * page 5043, scheme 1 * [A] 7,12-14,37-40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2006.07.045 | [DYA] - K. KOPKA ET. AL., "5-Pyrrolidinylsulfinyl Isatins as a Potential Tool for the Molecular Imaging of Caspases in Apoptosis.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 49, no. 23, pages 6704 - 6715, XP002551895 [DY] 1-6,8-11,15-36 * tables 1,2 * [A] 7,12-14,37-40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm051217c | [T] - G. SMITH ET. AL., "Design, Synthesis, and Biological Characterization of a Caspase 3/7 Selective Isatin Labeled with 2-[18F]fluoroethylazide.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20081202), vol. 51, pages 8057 - 8067, XP002551896 [T] 1-40 * figures 1-8; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm801107u |