EP2326584 - TAPE APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sherriff, Dean Robert 1 Dalton Terrace York, North Yorkshire YO24 4DA / GB | For all designated states Seymour, David Terry Orchard House Moorside Farm Wellington Road Wilsden, West Yorkshire BD15 0LZ / GB | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785113.3 | 16.09.2009 | [2011/22] | WO2009GB02206 | Priority number, date | GB20080017019 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0817019 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031999 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2326584 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/00 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
B65H35/0033 (EP,US);
B65H35/0073 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | BANDAUFBRINGVORRICHTUNG | [2011/22] | English: | TAPE APPLICATOR | [2011/22] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE BANDE ADHÉSIVE | [2011/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1033339 (WUERTH ADOLF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-7,13-20 * the whole document * [I] 21-27; | [XAI]JPH08127460 (SOUWA SYST KAIHATSU KK) [X] 1-4,6,13-19,21-27 * the whole document * [A] 7-12 [I] 5,20; | [X]NL1028987C (ROOBEEK ADRIANUS GERARDUS [NL]) [X] 1,4-5,13-18 * figure - * | Examination | US6145722 | US5065925 |