EP2356261 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ALCOHOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weyland AS Lonningsflaten 22 5258 Blomsterdalen / NO | [2012/23] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Weyland AS Fanaveien 221 5239 Rådal / NO | ||
For:GB
Cockbain, Julian 42 Southmoor Road Oxford OX2 6RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEYDAHL, Karl, Ragnar Espehaugen 25 N-5258 Blomsterdalen / NO | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
WEYDAHL, Karl, Ragnar Weyland AS Fanaveien 221 N-5239 Rådal / NO | Representative(s) | Cockbain, Julian Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Cockbain, Julian Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785188.5 | 02.10.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009GB02349 | Priority number, date | GB20080019406 | 22.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0819406 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010046619 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356261 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C13K1/02 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
C13K1/02 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Extension states | AL | 18.05.2011 | BA | 18.05.2011 | RS | 18.05.2011 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKOHOL | [2011/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ALCOHOL | [2011/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D ALCOOL | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 20.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB376323 (HENRY DREYFUS) [A] 1-17* page 5, line 43 - line 51; example .; claim - *; | [A]GB602833 (MELLE USINES SA) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 23 - line 31; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6007636 (LIGHTNER GENE E [US]) [A] 1-17 * figure -; example - *; | [AD]WO0202826 (HELLAND KNUT [NO], et al) [AD] 1-17 * example -; claim - * |