EP2351200 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO POWER ADAPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADP Corporate Limited 3-4 Faulkner's Alley London EC1M 6DD / GB | [2020/26] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Holdip Limited Prospect Chambers Prospect Hill Douglas Isle of Man IM1 1ET / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMMERLAND, David 4 Longcliff Close Old Dalby Leicestershire LE14 3LU / GB | 02 /
POLLOCK, Helen Edison House Station Approach Oakham Rutland LE15 6QW / GB | 03 /
POLLOCK, Charles Edison House Station Approach Oakham Rutland LE15 6QW / GB | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street GB-Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785728.8 | 08.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009GB51334 | Priority number, date | GB20080018411 | 08.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0818411 | GB20080021297 | 21.11.2008 Original published format: GB 0821297 | GB20080022691 | 12.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0822691 | GB20090009139 | 28.05.2009 Original published format: GB 0909139 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041067 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351200 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/538 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
H05B45/39 (EP,US);
H02M3/28 (KR);
H02M7/538 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/382 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IM BEZUG AUF STROMADAPTERN | [2020/39] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO POWER ADAPTORS | [2011/31] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS À DES ADAPTATEURS DE PUISSANCE | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/31] | VERBESSERUNGEN IN BEZUG AUF ADAPTERNETZTEILE | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 09.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2014 | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2015 | 31.10.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.2016 | 31.10.2020 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5426350 (LAI JIH-SHENG [US]) [X] 1-34 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 39 - line 48 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 42 *; | [X]US2007236159 (BELAND ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-34 * figures 6,7B * * paragraph [0059] *; | [PX]WO2008120019 (LIGHT LTD E [GB], et al) [PX] 1-34 * column A * * page 19, line 32 - page 20, line 25 ** figure 4 * | Examination | EP0352983 | WO2008029330 | US2008094423 |