EP2421683 - TRANSVERSAL CUTTING GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknoweb S.r.L. Via dei Salici 7 26020 Palazzo Pignano (CR) / IT | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAMPOLLO, Fabio Via Diaz, 53 I-26013 Crema / IT | 02 /
MANDOTTI, Pierangelo Via G. Donizetti 54 I-26020 Palazzo Pignano / IT | [2012/13] |
Former [2012/09] | 01 /
ZAMPOLLO, Fabio Piazza Aldo Moro 1 I-26013 Crema / IT | ||
02 /
MANDOTTI, Pierangelo Via G. Donizetti 54 I-26020 Palazzo Pignano / IT | Representative(s) | Mari, Marco Giovanni, et al Ing. Mari & C. S.r.l. Via Garibotti, 3 26100 Cremona / IT | [2012/09] | Application number, filing date | 09786100.9 | 05.08.2009 | WO2009IB06448 | Priority number, date | IT2009CR00011 | 24.04.2009 Original published format: IT CR20090011 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122371 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421683 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2421683 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/14, B26D7/06, B26D7/20 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
B26D1/141 (EP);
B26D1/58 (EP);
B26D7/0625 (EP);
B26D7/20 (EP);
B26D1/16 (EP);
B26D2007/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | QUERSCHNEIDGRUPPE | [2012/09] | English: | TRANSVERSAL CUTTING GROUP | [2012/09] | French: | GROUPE DE COUPE TRANSVERSAL | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2009 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MK | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | SM | 11.07.2012 | IE | 05.08.2012 | LU | 05.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | NO | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 11.07.2012 | ||
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
SM | 11.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
LU | 05.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
SM | 11.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
LU | 05.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2153791 (GERBER GARMENT TECHNOLOGY INC) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19822230 (BRUDER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE202006018506U (METZNER MASCHB GMBH [DE]) |