EP2304795 - CMOS PHOTOGATE 3D CAMERA SYSTEM HAVING IMPROVED CHARGE SENSING CELL AND PIXEL GEOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft International Holdings B.V. Telestone 8-Teleport Naritaweg 165 1043 BW Amsterdam / NL | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, David 30/10 HaAlon Street 36811 Nesher / IL | 02 /
SHACHAM, Amit Kibbutz Givat Haim HaMeuchad 38930 Kibbutz Givat Haim / IL | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09786633.9 | 17.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009IB53113 | Priority number, date | US20080081400P | 17.07.2008 Original published format: US 81400 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010007594 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2304795 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/14603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | 3D-CMOS-PHOTOGATE-KAMERASYSTEM MIT VERBESSERTER LASTMESSZELLE UND PIXELGEOMETRIE | [2011/14] | English: | CMOS PHOTOGATE 3D CAMERA SYSTEM HAVING IMPROVED CHARGE SENSING CELL AND PIXEL GEOMETRY | [2011/14] | French: | SYSTÈME PHOTOGRAPHIQUE 3D À PHOTO-GRILLE CMOS À CELLULE DE DÉTECTION DE CHARGE ET À GÉOMÉTRIE DE PIXELS AMÉLIORÉES | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 24.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 13.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0757476 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]JPH10289992 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2004259733 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [PX]EP1995783 (SONY CORP [JP]) |