EP2319275 - ILLUMINATION DEVICE COMPRISING MULTIPLE LEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/19] | LLUMINATION DEVICE COMPRISING MULTIPLE LEDS | ||
[2013/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/19] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUERLÄNDER, Georg c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/19] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09786664.4 | 22.07.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009IB53173 | Priority number, date | EP20080161317 | 29.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08161317 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010013172 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319275 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2319275 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H05B45/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN LEDS | [2011/19] | English: | ILLUMINATION DEVICE COMPRISING MULTIPLE LEDS | [2013/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPORTANT DE MULTIPLES DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/19] | LLUMINATION DEVICE COMPRISING MULTIPLE LEDS | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2009 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | HR | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MK | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | SM | 20.11.2013 | NO | 20.02.2014 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | IE | 22.07.2014 | LU | 22.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.07.2009 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | |
NO | 20.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2034155 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 8 * figures 4a,6 *; | [A]US4113989 (SCHNEIDER CARL MICHAEL) [A] 8-10 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB1298275 (IBM [US]) [A] 8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3818203 (PERLOWSKI A, et al) [A] 8-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3714374 (SOBEL A) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007145914 (HONG HEE JUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0050] * |