EP2328508 - IMPROVED IMPLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H&F s.r.l. Piazzale Marcellino Champagnat 2 00144 Roma / IT | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANULLO, Luigi Via Donatello 11 00196 Roma / IT | [2011/27] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
CANULLO, Luigi Via Guido Reni, 56 00196 Roma / IT | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/23] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09787776.5 | 08.07.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009IT00300 | Priority number, date | IT2008RM00376 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: IT RM20080376 | [2011/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010004605 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2328508 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328508 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
A61C8/0022 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0069 (EP,US);
A61C8/0056 (EP,US);
A61C8/0078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2011/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES IMPLANTATSYSTEM | [2011/23] | English: | IMPROVED IMPLANT SYSTEM | [2011/23] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPLANT AMÉLIORÉ | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 14.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2009 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | GB | 08.07.2016 | IE | 08.07.2016 | LU | 08.07.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IE | 08.07.2016 | ||
LU | 08.07.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
GB | 08.07.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5282746 (SELLERS GRADY C [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figure 5 *; | [Y]US5816812 (KOWNACKI CHARLES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-7* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [Y]US6205837 (SAPKOS STANLEY W [US]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US6474991 (HANSSON STIG [SE]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 9a,9b * * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004091837 (HORIUCHI KIKUJI [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 2,3a; claim 1 * |