EP2291715 - Electrophotographic photosensitive drum unit and method for mounting a coupling member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/10] | DISMOUNTING AND MOUNTING METHODS FOR COUPLING AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOSENSITIVE DRUM UNIT | ||
[2016/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hara, Nobuyoshi C/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATORI Yoshiyuki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
HARA, Nobuyoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2017/02] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
BATORI Yoshiyuki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
HARA, Nobuyoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
BATORI Yoshiyuki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/02] |
Former [2011/10] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09787976.1 | 15.06.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009JP61266 | Priority number, date | JP20080207291 | 11.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008207291 | JP20080161527 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161527 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010004854 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2291715 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2291715 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/16, G03G21/18, G03G15/00 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
G03G15/757 (EP,US);
G03G21/18 (KR);
G03G15/75 (US);
G03G15/1615 (KR);
G03G15/751 (US);
G03G21/00 (RU);
G03G21/1647 (US);
G03G21/181 (EP,US);
G03G21/186 (EP,US);
G03G21/1864 (EP,RU,US);
G03G21/20 (KR);
G03G2215/00987 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1657 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | G03G21/18, G03G15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrofotografische lichtempfindliche Trommeleinheit und Verfahren zur Montage eines Kupplungsbauteils | [2016/19] | English: | Electrophotographic photosensitive drum unit and method for mounting a coupling member | [2016/19] | French: | Unité de tambour photosensible électrophotographique et procédé de montage d'un élément de couplage | [2016/19] |
Former [2011/10] | DEMONTAGE- UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN FÜR EINE KUPPLUNG UND EINE ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHE LICHTEMPFINDLICHE TROMMELEINHEIT | ||
Former [2011/10] | DISMOUNTING AND MOUNTING METHODS FOR COUPLING AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOSENSITIVE DRUM UNIT | ||
Former [2011/10] | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉMONTAGE ET DE MONTAGE D'UN ORGANE DE COUPLAGE D'UN TAMBOUR ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE PHOTOSENSIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16202843.5 / EP3173875 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 01.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | IE | 15.06.2017 | LU | 15.06.2017 | MT | 15.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
MT | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
MT | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2008152388 (UENO TAKAHITO [JP], et al) [I] 2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0546] - [0613] * [A] 1,3,5-9; | [A]US6464589 (SHINOZUKA KINZOU [JP]) [A] 2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] *; | [A]JP2006072160 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] *; | [A]US2006240896 (OHASHI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] , [0060] * | Examination | US2007237545 | US2008279584 | WO2009154311 |