EP2397006 - CONTROLLING ENERGY CONSUMPTION OF A WIRELESS NETWORK NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/20] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRENGER, Pål Tomatvägen 20 S-SE-164 83 Linköping / SE | 02 /
HAGERMAN, Bo Hästhagsvägen 7 S-SE-135 52 Tyresö / SE | 03 /
LINDOFF, Bengt 237 36 Bjärred / SE | 04 /
PARKVALL, Stefan 113 25 Stockholm / SE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/20] |
Former [2011/51] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09788488.6 | 13.02.2009 | [2017/20] | WO2009SE50156 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010093296 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397006 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2397006 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W52/28, H04W52/34, H04W36/22, H04L29/08, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W88/08 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04W52/28 (US);
H04L65/40 (US);
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W72/0473 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/29] | H04W36/22, H04L29/08, H04W52/28, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W88/08, H04W52/02, H04W52/34 | ||
Former IPC [2011/51] | H04W52/34, H04W52/02, H04W40/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DES ENERGIEVERBRAUCHS EINES DRAHTLOSEN NETZKNOTENS | [2011/51] | English: | CONTROLLING ENERGY CONSUMPTION OF A WIRELESS NETWORK NODE | [2011/51] | French: | MAÎTRISE DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE D'UN NOEUD DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2016/30] |
Former [2011/51] | MAÎTRISE DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE D'UN N UD DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17165037.7 / EP3206443 | EP19188081.4 / EP3609246 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | LU | 13.02.2018 | MT | 13.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.02.2018 | ||
MT | 13.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.02.2018 | ||
MT | 13.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 13.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006130662 (MILLENNIAL NET INC [US], et al) [A] 1,11,17,19 * abstract * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 18 * * page 10, line 3 - line 16 *; | [A]US2009010190 (GONG XIAOHONG [US]) [A] 1,11,17,19 * abstract ** paragraphs [0038] - [0041] * | Examination | US2007066329 | by applicant | WO2006130662 |