EP2414362 - PYRIMIDINE SUBSTITUTED PURINE COMPOUNDS AS KINASE (S) INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verastem, Inc. 215 First Street, Suite 440 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states S*BIO Pte Ltd 1 Science Park Road 05-09 The Capricorn Singapore Science Park II Singapore 117528 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, DiZhong Block 212 11-126 Chua Chu Kang Central Singapore 680 212 / SG | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Meredith 1E Pine Grove 01-18 Singapore 594001 / SG | [2014/18] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
CHEN, DiZhong Block 212 11-126 Chua Chu Kang Central Singapore 680 212 / SG | ||
02 /
WILLIAMS, Meredith 1 Pine Grove 04-66 Singapore 591 301 / SG | Representative(s) | Schwahn, Hartmut, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/06] | Schwahn, Hartmut, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09788615.4 | 03.04.2009 | WO2009SG00124 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114484 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414362 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2414362 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/32, A61K31/52, A61P35/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
C07D473/32 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C12Y207/01137 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIMIDINSUBSTITUIERTE PURINVERBINDUNGEN ALS KINASE-(S)-INHIBITOREN | [2012/06] | English: | PYRIMIDINE SUBSTITUTED PURINE COMPOUNDS AS KINASE (S) INHIBITORS | [2012/06] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PURINE SUBSTITUÉE PAR PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS D'UNE OU PLUSIEURS KINASES | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2009 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | HR | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | LT | 11.06.2014 | |
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1277738 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-46 * claims 1,8-12 *; | [A]WO2004048365 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * claims 1,9,23,26-36 * | by applicant | WO2008SG00379 |