EP2344714 - PINLESS SECURITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Fire & Security GmbH Victor von Bruns-Strasse 21 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics, LLC One Town Center Road Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics, LLC 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Luis 4692 Bison Street Boca Raton FL 33428 / US | 02 /
RENDON, Oscar 13450 SW 178th St Miami, FL 33177 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
ANDERSON, Luis 4692 Bison Street Boca Raton FL 33428 / US | ||
02 /
RENDON, Oscar 9210 NW 13th Place Coral Springs FL 33071 / US | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Hafner, Dieter, et al Hafner & Partner Patent-/Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Hafner-Tergau-Walkenhorst Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09788769.9 | 15.05.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US03034 | Priority number, date | US20080198923P | 12.11.2008 Original published format: US 198923 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056261 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344714 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2344714 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00, E05B47/00, E05B69/00 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
E05B73/0052 (EP);
E05B73/00 (KR);
E05B47/00 (KR);
E05B49/00 (KR);
E05B69/00 (KR);
E05B73/0017 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STIFTLOSE SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/29] | English: | PINLESS SECURITY DEVICE | [2011/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ SANS ERGOT | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2009 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | IE | 15.05.2016 | LU | 15.05.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2305212 (DUNNE STEPHEN TERENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1-2,7-10,12-14,18-20 * the whole document * [Y] 3-4,15-16; | [XA]GB2150207 (PLASTI MAX SRL) [X] 1,5-6,12-13,17-20 * the whole document * [A] 2,8-9; | [X]WO2008068725 (BELL OAK INVEST CLOSE CORP [ZA], et al) [X] 1,8-9,11-13,18-20 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6705133 (AVGANIM ALEXANDER G [IL]) [X] 1,10,18-20 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 51; figures 3,4 * [Y] 3-4,15-16 | by applicant | GB2305212 | GB2150207 | WO2008068725 | US6705133 |