EP2313853 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND INTERFACES FOR RESEARCHING CONTRACTUAL PRECEDENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Reuters Global Resources Unlimited Company Neuhofstrasse 1 6340 Baar / CH | [2017/31] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Thomson Reuters Global Resources Neuhofstrasse 1 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURAN, Jennifer Anne 3220 Birchtree Lane Silver Spring Maryland 20906 / US | 02 /
WIGHT, James 610 Opperman Drive Eagan Minnesota 55123 / US | 03 /
ALBERS, Heidi 15912 Cascade Path Rosemount Minnesota 55068 / US | 04 /
THODY, Lora C. Siegler 35 Furlong Road Rochester New York 14623 / US | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Kretschmer, Thomas, et al Thomson Reuters Global Resources Unlimited Company Neuhofstrasse 1 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09788893.7 | 10.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009US04023 | Priority number, date | US20080134605P | 11.07.2008 Original published format: US 134605 P | US20080113851P | 12.11.2008 Original published format: US 113851 P | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010005586 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313853 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND SCHNITTSTELLEN ZUM RECHERCHIEREN VON VERTRAGLICHEN PRÄZEDENZFÄLLEN | [2011/17] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND INTERFACES FOR RESEARCHING CONTRACTUAL PRECEDENTS | [2011/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET INTERFACES POUR RECHERCHER DES PRÉCÉDENTS CONTRACTUELS | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 12.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 16.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/25] | 05.02.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 15 PCT) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion and the reference below., XP002456414 [L] 1-7 | Examination | US2006195430 | US2008016116 | US2008082929 |