EP2301299 - CONCENTRATOR FOR MULTIPLEXING ACCESS POINT TO WIRELESS NETWORK CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Damanjit 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
HORN, Gavin B. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
SONG, Osok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP, Peerapol 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 05 /
GUPTA, Rajarshi 5775 Morehouse San Diego California 92121 / US | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09789908.2 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009US48309 | Priority number, date | US20080074978P | 23.06.2008 Original published format: US 74978 P | US20080079393P | 09.07.2008 Original published format: US 79393 P | US20080087145P | 07.08.2008 Original published format: US 87145 P | US20090487569 | 18.06.2009 Original published format: US 487569 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010008853 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2301299 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, H04W92/12, H04W36/08 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP,BR,US);
H04W76/16 (KR);
H04W88/08 (BR,KR,US);
H04W36/0005 (EP,BR);
H04W36/0027 (KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W76/11 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W88/12 (EP,BR,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | KONZENTRATOR FÜR MULTIPLEX-ZUGANGSPUNKT ZU DRAHTLOSEN NETZVERBINDUNGEN | [2011/13] | English: | CONCENTRATOR FOR MULTIPLEXING ACCESS POINT TO WIRELESS NETWORK CONNECTIONS | [2011/13] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR POUR MULTIPLEXER UN POINT D'ACCÈS AVEC DES CONNEXIONS DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 10.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | EP16180701.1 / EP3101993 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |