EP2303332 - ANTHRACYCLINE CONJUGATES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS ANTITUMOR COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/14] | ANTHRACYCLINE DERIVATIVE CONJUGATES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS ANTITUMOR COMPOUNDS | ||
[2014/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES S.R.L. Viale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano (MI) / IT | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERIA, Italo c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | 02 /
CARUSO, Michele c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | 03 /
FLYGARE, John, A. c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
LUPI, Vittoria c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | 05 /
PEREGO, Rita c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | 06 /
POLAKIS, Paul c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 07 /
POLSON, Andrew c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 08 /
SALSA, Matteo c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | 09 /
SPENCER, Susan, D. c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 10 /
VALSASINA, Barbara c/o Nerviano MedicalSciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | [2015/01] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
BERIA, Italo c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | ||
02 /
CARUSO, Michele c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | |||
03 /
FLYGARE, John, A. c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
04 /
LUPI, Vittoria c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | |||
05 /
PEREGO, Rita c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | |||
06 /
POLAKIS, Paul c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
07 /
POLSON, Andrew c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
08 /
SALSA, Matteo c/o Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | |||
09 /
SPENCER, Susan, D. c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
10 /
VALSASINA, Barbara c/o Nerviano MedicalSciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur 10 20014 Nerviano, MI / IT | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2011/14] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09790394.2 | 14.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009US50537 | Priority number, date | US20080080944P | 15.07.2008 Original published format: US 80944 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010009124 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2303332 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2303332 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
C07D498/14 (KR);
C07K16/2863 (US);
A61K31/5383 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/6809 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Extension states | AL | 06.01.2011 | BA | 06.01.2011 | RS | 06.01.2011 | Title | German: | ANTHRACYCLINKONJUGATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ANTITUMORMITTEL | [2014/36] | English: | ANTHRACYCLINE CONJUGATES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS ANTITUMOR COMPOUNDS | [2014/36] | French: | CONJUGUÉS DE DÉRIVÉS D ANTHRACYCLINE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET UTILISATION COMME COMPOSÉS ANTITUMORAUX | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/14] | ANTHRAZYKLIN-DERIVAT-KONJUGATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTITUMORALE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2011/14] | ANTHRACYCLINE DERIVATIVE CONJUGATES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS ANTITUMOR COMPOUNDS | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 31.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2014 | 11.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2009 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MK | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | SM | 31.12.2014 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | IE | 14.07.2015 | LU | 14.07.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0398305 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55 * figures 1,2 *; | [XDY]WO9202255 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) [XD] 1-3,10-13,17-20 * example 13 * [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55; | [XY]EP0476408 (BRUNSWICK CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,10-13,17-20 * example III * [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55; | [Y]GB2315067 (PHARMACIA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55 * the whole document *; | [XDY]US5776458 (ANGELUCCI FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [XD] 1-3,10-13,17-20 * examples 13-39; claim 1 * [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55; | [XY]WO2004067038 (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13,17-20 * paragraph [0055]; claim 2 * [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55; | [E]WO2009099741 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-55* the whole document *; | [XDY] - HAMANN P R, "Monoclonal antibody-drug conjugates", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS 200509 GB LNKD- DOI:10.1517/13543776.15.9.1087, (200509), vol. 15, no. 9, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 1087 - 1103, XP002606237 [XD] 1-3,10-13,17-20 * compound 3b * [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.15.9.1087 | [XY] - KING H D ET AL, "BR96 CONJUGATES OF HIGHLY POTENT ANTHRACYCLINES", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0960-894X(03)00375-5, (20030101), vol. 13, no. 13, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2119 - 2122, XP001193826 [X] 1-3,10-13,17-20 * compound 3b * [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(03)00375-5 | [YD] - QUINTIERI LUIGI ET AL, "Formation and antitumor activity of PNU-159682, a major metabolite of nemorubicin in human liver microsomes", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050215), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1608 - 1617, XP002576594 [YD] 1-55 * abstract * | [Y] - GARNETT M C, "Targeted drug conjugates: Principles and progress", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0169-409X(01)00227-7, (20011217), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 171 - 216, XP002261805 [Y] 1-55 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(01)00227-7 | [Y] - ROBERT J ET AL, "PHARMACOKINETICS AND METABOLISM OF ANTHRACYCLINES", CANCER SURVEYS, OXFORD, GB, (19930101), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 219 - 252, XP000893095 [Y] 4-9,14-16,21-55 * the whole document * | Examination | - Stephen C Alley ET AL, "Antibody-drug conjugates: targeted drug delivery for cancer", Current Opinion in Chemical Biology, (20100801), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.cbpa.2010.06.170, ISSN 1367-5931, pages 529 - 537, XP055042125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2010.06.170 | - John M. Lambert, "Drug-conjugated antibodies for the treatment of cancer", British Journal of Clinical Pharmacology, (20130823), vol. 76, no. 2, doi:10.1111/bcp.12044, ISSN 0306-5251, pages 248 - 262, XP055113941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/bcp.12044 | by applicant | US3773919 | WO9321319 | EP0616812 | US5362852 | US5583024 | WO9704801 | US5674713 | US5700670 | US5821337 | WO0014228 | WO0148204 | WO0230268 | WO02054940 | WO02059377 | WO02064798 | WO02078524 | WO02086443 | WO02099122 | WO02098358 | WO02099074 | WO02102235 | WO03003906 | WO03016475 | WO03024392 | WO03025138 | WO03029421 | WO03042661 | WO03055443 | US2003134790 | US6602677 | US2003224454 | WO2004032842 | WO2004048938 | WO2004063362 | US2005107595 | US2005106644 | US2005276812 | US2008311134 | US7498298 | US7521541 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - DIJKE,P. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 264, no. 5155, pages 101 - 104 | - ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1377 - 1382 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (1999), vol. 255, no. 2, pages 283 - 288 | - NATURE, (1998), vol. 395, no. 6699, pages 288 - 291 | - GAUGITSCH, H.W. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 16, pages 11267 - 11273 | - CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, no. 15, pages 5857 - 5860 | - HUBERT, R.S. ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 266, pages 593 - 602 | - LIANG ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 4907 - 12 | - GLYNNE-JONES ET AL., INT J CANCER., (20011015), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 178 - 84 | - HERMANSON, G.T., Bioconjugate Techniques, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), pages 234 - 242 | - GEOGHEGAN; STROH, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1992), vol. 3, pages 138 - 146 | - YU, D. S. ET AL., J. UROL., (1988), vol. 140, page 415 | - SMITH, P. K. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 150, page 76 | - BRADFORD, M. M., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1976), vol. 72, page 248 | - GALLEGO, J. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1984), vol. 33, page 737 | - HAMBLETT ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 7063 - 7070 | - SANDERSON ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, pages 843 - 852 | - ISHIMI ET AL., JOUR. BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, no. 46, pages 42744 - 42752 | - CROUCH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1993), vol. 160, pages 81 - 88 | - CREE ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 398 - 404 | WO2009US31199 |