EP2334651 - DUAL-ACTING ANTIHYPERTENSIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theravance, Inc. 901 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Seok-ki 1815 Pauline Boulevard Unit 4 Ann Arbor Michigan 48103 / US | 02 /
FATHEREE, Paul R. 921 Minnesota Street San Francisco California 94107 / US | 03 /
GENDRON, Roland 345 Franconia Street San Francisco California 94110 / US | 04 /
MCKINNELL, Robert Murray 321 Poplar Avenue San Mateo California 94030 / US | 05 /
BLAIR, Brooke 116 Precita Avenue San Francisco California 94110 / US | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
CHOI, Seok-ki 1815 Pauline Boulevard Unit 4 Ann Arbor Michigan 48103 / US | ||
02 /
FATHEREE, Paul R. 921 Minnesota Street San Francisco California 94107 / US | |||
03 /
GENDRON, Roland 345 Franconia Street San Francisco California 94110 / US | |||
04 /
MCKINNELL, Robert Murray 241 La Cruz Avenue Millbrae California 94030 / US | |||
05 /
BLAIR, Brooke 116 Precita Avenue San Francisco California 94110 / US | Representative(s) | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09790756.2 | 23.07.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009US51507 | Priority number, date | US20080135806P | 24.07.2008 Original published format: US 135806 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010011821 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2334651 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/64, C07D233/68, C07D233/90, C07D249/08, C07D249/10, C07D401/14, C07D403/10, A61K31/4174, A61K31/4178, A61K31/4196, A61P9/12 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
A61K31/4196 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D233/68 (EP,US);
C07D233/90 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D249/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | BLUTDRUCKSENKENDE MITTEL MIT DUALER WIRKUNG | [2011/25] | English: | DUAL-ACTING ANTIHYPERTENSIVE AGENTS | [2011/25] | French: | AGENTS ANTI-HYPERTENSIFS À DOUBLE ACTION | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6090828 (REITZ DAVID B [US]) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [AD]WO2007056546 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-28 * SC-52458 on page 11; structure on page 15 and compound (II) on page 18; page 9 *; | [AP]WO2008133896 (THERAVANCE INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-28* the whole document *; | [A] - ASHTON, WALLACE T. ET AL, "Nonpeptide angiotensin II antagonists derived from 4H-1,2,4-triazoles and 3H-imidazo[1,2-b][1,2,4]triazoles", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 36(5), 591-609 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (1993), XP002560086 [A] 1-28 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00057a009 |