EP2342487 - APPARATUS TO DETERMINE A POSITION OF A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Process Management Regulator Technologies, Inc. 310 East University Drive McKinney, TX 75070 / US | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chun 623 Bandera Street McKinney TX 75070 / US | 02 /
PELFREY, Roy, Ronald 1331 S. Travis Street Sherman TX 75090 / US | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09791787.6 | 21.08.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009US54620 | Priority number, date | US20080247838 | 08.10.2008 Original published format: US 247838 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010042276 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342487 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
F16K37/0008 (EP,US);
F16K1/12 (EP,US);
F16K31/52408 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES VENTILS | [2011/28] | English: | APPARATUS TO DETERMINE A POSITION OF A VALVE | [2011/28] | French: | APPAREIL POUR DÉTERMINER LA POSITION D UNE SOUPAPE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 24.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1115090 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG) [X] 1-4,9,11,15,18-21 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 10; figure . *; | [X]GB911576 (WILLIAM HUME & COMPANY LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,9,11,15,18-21 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 46; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US3844312 (SUMMER W, et al) [Y] 12-14* column 3, line 7 - column 7, line 5; figures 1,4-7 *; | [X]DE2631100 (GERDTS GUSTAV F KG) [X] 1-4,8-11,15,18-21 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 8; figure - *; | [XY]WO9427069 (FISCHER GEORG ROHRLEITUNG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11,15,18-21 * page 2, line 9 - page 5, line 30; figure 1 * [Y] 12-14; | [X]DE102005009989 (ERHARD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-11,15,18-21 * paragraphs [0014] - [0021]; figures 1,2 * |