EP2337799 - USES OF IL-22, IL-17, AND IL-1 FAMILY CYTOKINES IN AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRIER, Yijun 44 Page Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
MA, Hak-Ling 120e Tall Oaks Drive Weymouth, MA 02190 / US | 03 /
DUNUSSI-JOANNOPOULOS, Kyriaki 64 Douglas Road Belmont, MA 02190 / US | 04 /
MEDLEY, Quintus, G. 38 Russell Road Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/26] | Porter, Jonathan Philip Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09792056.5 | 28.08.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009US55366 | Priority number, date | US20080092743P | 28.08.2008 Original published format: US 92743 P | US20080193087P | 27.10.2008 Original published format: US 193087 P | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010025369 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337799 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/245 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39566 (KR);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K16/244 (KR);
A61K2039/507 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ZYTOKINEN DER IL-22-, IL-17- UND IL-1-FAMILIE BEI AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN | [2011/26] | English: | USES OF IL-22, IL-17, AND IL-1 FAMILY CYTOKINES IN AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES | [2011/26] | French: | UTILISATIONS DE CYTOKINES DES FAMILLES IL-22, IL-17, ET IL-1 DANS LES MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 28.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004047864 (ADVANCED BIOTHERAPY INC [US], et al) [A] 13 * page 9, line 5 - line 11 * * page 19, line 23 - page 21, line 21 * * claims 1-17 *; | [A]WO2007076523 (CENTOCOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5,15 * claims 1-3,15-17 *; | [Y]WO2007106769 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 13-14 * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0217] * * examples 3-6 * * claims 35-55 *; | [Y]WO2007126439 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 12 * example 14 * * claims 1-11,15-26 *; | [Y]WO2008021156 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 13-14 * page 43, line 13 - page 46, line 25 * * example 16 * * claims 31-35 *; | [XY]WO2008033333 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 6-7,11 * claims 31-33,50-52,68-70 * [Y] 12-14; | [XI] - BLUMBERG HAL ET AL, "Opposing activities of two novel members of the IL-1 ligand family regulate skin inflammation.", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE 29 OCT 2007, (20071029), vol. 204, no. 11, ISSN 1540-9538, pages 2603 - 2614, XP007911379 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2608, column r, paragraph l - page 2609, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 6 * [I] 15-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20070157 | [XA] - DEBETS R ET AL, "Two novel IL-1 family members, IL-1 delta and IL-1 epsilon, function as an antagonist and agonist of NF-kappa B activation through the orphan IL-1 receptor-related protein 2", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20010801), vol. 167, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1440 - 1446, XP002418787 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 6 * [A] 15-16 | [Y] - MA HAK-LING ET AL, "IL-22 is required for Th17 cell-mediated pathology in a mouse model of psoriasis-like skin inflammation.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION FEB 2008, (200802), vol. 118, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 597 - 607, XP007911382 [Y] 12 * page 603, column r, paragraph l - page 604, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI33263 | [A] - SIMS J ET AL, "11 IL-1 family members in inflammatory skin disease", ERNST SCHERING RESEARCH FOUNDATION WORKSHOP, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060101), no. 56, ISSN 0947-6075, pages 187 - 191, XP009128638 [A] 1-7,11-12,14-16 * the whole document * | [A] - BARKSBY H E ET AL, "The expanding family of interleukin-1 cytokines and their role in destructive inflammatory disorders.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY AUG 2007, (200708), vol. 149, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 217 - 225, XP002566163 [A] 1-7,11-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2249.2007.03441.x | [A] - ASARCH ADAM ET AL, "Th17 cells: a new therapeutic target in inflammatory dermatoses", JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGICAL TREATMENT, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (20080101), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0954-6634, pages 318 - 326, XP009128652 [A] 1-7,11-16 * page 323, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09546630802206660 | [A] - LOWES MICHELLE A ET AL, "Psoriasis vulgaris lesions contain discrete populations of Th1 and Th17 T cells.", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY MAY 2008, (200805), vol. 128, no. 5, ISSN 1523-1747, pages 1207 - 1211, XP007911381 [A] 1-7,11-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jid.5701213 |