EP2344408 - SWIVEL SEAT WITH ADJUSTABLE SWIVEL RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Equipment Corporation A Corporation of the State of Ohio 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Crown Equipment Corporation A Corporation Of The State Of Ohio 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADELSPERGER, Peter Lange Feldstr. 22 85435 Erding / DE | 02 /
BABEL, Christoph Waltherstrasse 29 D-80337 Munich / DE | 03 /
HOISS, Michael Kohlerstrasse 5 85604 Poring / DE | 04 /
KRAIMER, James Am Amperberg 14 85778 Haimhausen / DE | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
ADELSPERGER, Peter Lange Feldstr. 22 85435 Erding / DE | ||
02 /
BABEL, Christoph Waltherstrasse 29 D-80337 Munich / DE | |||
03 /
HOISS, Michael Kohlerstrasse 5 85604 Poring / DE | |||
04 /
KRAIMER, James Brahmsstr. 43 81667 Munich / DE | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Cummings, Sean Patrick Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2011/29] | Cummings, Sean Patrick Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 09792807.1 | 22.09.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US57755 | Priority number, date | US20080098928P | 22.09.2008 Original published format: US 98928 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010033956 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344408 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2344408 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/46, B60N2/24, B60N2/14, B66F9/075 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
B66F9/07545 (EP,US);
B60N2/14 (EP,US);
B60N2/24 (EP,US);
B60N2/797 (EP,US);
B66F9/0759 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | B66C13/56, B66F9/075, B60N2/14, B60N2/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWENKBARER SITZ MIT EINSTELLBAREM SCHWENKWIDERSTAND | [2011/29] | English: | SWIVEL SEAT WITH ADJUSTABLE SWIVEL RESISTANCE | [2011/29] | French: | SIÈGE PIVOTANT DOTÉ D'UNE RÉSISTANCE PIVOTANTE AJUSTABLE | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2009 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | IE | 22.09.2014 | LU | 22.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.09.2009 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.09.2009 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1260477 (TCM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0027]; claim 7 *; | [A]EP1367474 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,14* the whole document *; | [DA]US2006061122 (BILLGER STEVEN C [US], et al) [DA] 1,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1260477 | EP1367474 | US7121608 |