EP2366196 - DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL PANELS, SUPPORT SYSTEM AND INSTALLED ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poivet, Alain 79 Avenue de Saint Cloud 78000 Versailles / FR | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2011/38] | Application number, filing date | 09793554.8 | 17.11.2009 | WO2009FR01322 | Priority number, date | FR20080006419 | 17.11.2008 Original published format: FR 0806419 | [2011/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010055235 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2366196 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048, E04D13/18, F24J2/52 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP,US);
F24S25/00 (US);
F24S25/20 (EP,US);
F24S25/35 (EP,US);
F24S40/44 (EP,US);
F24S2025/021 (EP,US);
F24S2025/801 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM TRAGEN VON FOTOVOLTAICZELLENPANELS, TRÄGERSYSTEM UND INSTALLIERTE BAUGRUPPE | [2011/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL PANELS, SUPPORT SYSTEM AND INSTALLED ASSEMBLY | [2011/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT DE PANNEAUX DE CELLULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES, SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT ET ENSEMBLE INSTALLÉ | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 13.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]JPH1113224 (KUBOTA KK) [XD] 1,2,8,9,12-14 * abstract *; | [XD]JP2000154625 (MISAWA HOMES CO) [XD] 1,2,8,9,12-14 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001164713 (MISAWA HOMES CO) [A] 1,2,5,8-14 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003343057 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]DE20219173U (LEITHOLD WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document *; | [XDY]DE202005007855U (ENERGIEBAU SOLARSTROMSYSTEME G [DE]) [XD] 1,2,8,9,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [A]DE202005012993U (PHOENIX SONNENSTROM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,8,9 * paragraphs [0033] - [0038]; figures 1,2,7,8; claim 1 *; | [AY]DE102005039495 (GUTMANN HERMANN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,9,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 7 | by applicant | JPH1113224 | JP2000154625 | DE202005007855U |