EP2307549 - INFLUENZA VIRUS-LIKE PARTICLES (VLPS) COMPRISING HEMAGGLUTININ [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medicago Inc. 1020 route de l'Eglise Suite 600 Québec, Québec G1V 3V9 / CA | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AOUST, Marc-Andre 3925 Louise-Fiset Quebec Quebec G1X 4N4 / CA | 02 /
COUTURE, Manon 4765 rue de la Sarcelle St.-Augustin-de-Desmaures Quebec G3A 2A5 / CA | 03 /
ORS, Frédéric 3940 rue Mathieu d'Amour Québec Québec G1Y 2J8 / CA | 04 /
TREPANIER, Sonia 314 de la Seine St-Nicolas Québec G7A 2P8 / CA | 05 /
LAVOIE, Pierre-Olivier 621 Franklin Quebec Quebec G1N 2L7 / CA | 06 /
DARGIS, Michèle 6358 St.-Jacques Québec Québec G2C 1M4 / CA | 07 /
VEZINA, Louis-Philippe 206, Route 138 Neuville Québec G0A 2R0 / CA | 08 /
LANDRY, Nathalie 1877, Allee Cavaliere St-Romauld Quebec G6W 0C1 / CA | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 09793741.1 | 02.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009CA00926 | Priority number, date | WO2008CA01281 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: PCT/CA2008/001281 | WO2009CA00032 | 12.01.2009 Original published format: PCT/CA2009/000032 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010003225 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307549 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A61K39/145, A61P31/16, A61P37/04, C07K14/11, C12N15/44, C12N7/01, C12N7/02, C12N15/29 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP,EA);
C12N15/8258 (EA,KR);
A01H5/00 (EA);
A61K39/12 (EP,EA);
A61K39/145 (EP,EA,KR);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,EA);
C12N15/82 (EA);
C12N7/00 (EP,EA,KR);
C12N9/90 (EA);
C12Y503/04001 (EA);
G06F9/505 (EA);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K2039/543 (EP,EA);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,EA);
A61K2039/55583 (EP,EA);
A61K2039/55588 (EA);
A61K2039/58 (EP,EA);
C07K2319/02 (EP,EA);
C07K2319/03 (EA);
C12N2760/16022 (EA,KR);
C12N2760/16122 (EP,EA,KR);
C12N2760/16123 (EP,EA,KR);
C12N2760/16133 (EA);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,EA,KR);
C12N2760/16151 (EA);
C12N2760/16171 (EA);
C12N2760/16222 (EA,KR);
C12N2760/16223 (EA,KR);
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | C12N15/82, A61K39/145, A61P31/16, C12N15/44, C12N7/00, C12N7/01, C07K14/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | INFLUENZA-VIRUS-LIKE-PARTIKEL (VLPS) MIT HÄMAGGLUTININ | [2011/15] | English: | INFLUENZA VIRUS-LIKE PARTICLES (VLPS) COMPRISING HEMAGGLUTININ | [2011/15] | French: | PARTICULES DE TYPE VIRUS (VLP) DE LA GRIPPE COMPRENANT DE L'HÉMAGGLUTININE | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 31.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 24.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | EP12181077.4 / EP2570484 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004098533 (THOMPSON BOYCE PLANT RES [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3-15; | [XY] - MUSIYCHUK KONSTANTIN ET AL, "A launch vector for the production of vaccine antigens in plants", INFLUENZA AND OTHER RESPIRATORY VIRUSES, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, UK LNKD- DOI:10.1111/J.1750-2659.2006.00005.X, vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1750-2640, (20070101), pages 19 - 25, (20070119), XP009058889 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1750-2659.2006.00005.x | [Y] - PUSHKO ET AL, "Influenza virus-like particles comprised of the HA, NA, and M1 proteins of H9N2 influenza virus induce protective immune responses in BALB/c mice", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2005.07.098, (20051230), vol. 23, no. 50, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 5751 - 5759, XP005180698 [Y] 1,3-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2005.07.098 | [Y] - GRGACIC E V L ET AL, "Virus-like particles: Passport to immune recognition", METHODS : A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.YMETH.2006.07.018, vol. 40, no. 1, ISSN 1046-2023, (20060901), pages 60 - 65, (20060901), XP024908472 [Y] 1,3-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2006.07.018 | [Y] - SAINT-JORE-DUPAS ET AL, "From planta to pharma with glycosylation in the toolbox", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20070701), vol. 25, no. 7, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 317 - 323, XP022116342 [Y] 1,3-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - D'AOUST MARC-ANDRÉ ET AL, "Influenza virus-like particles produced by transient expression in Nicotiana benthamiana induce a protective immune response against a lethal viral challenge in mice.", PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL DEC 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:19076615, (200812), vol. 6, no. 9, ISSN 1467-7644, pages 930 - 940, XP002598510 [XP] 1,3-15 * the whole document * | [T] - D'AOUST MARC-ANDRE ET AL, "The production of hemagglutinin-based virus-like particles in plants: a rapid, efficient and safe response to pandemic influenza", PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (201006), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1467-7644, pages 607 - 619, XP002598511 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1467-7652.2009.00496.x | International search | [A]WO2004098533 (THOMPSON BOYCE PLANT RES [US], et al); | [A]WO2007130327 (TECHNOVAX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2008060669 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US], et al); | [AP]WO2009008573 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR], et al); | [YP] - D'AOUST M-A ET AL., "Influenza virus-like particles produced by transient expression in Nicotiana benthamiana induce a protective immune response against a lethal viral challenge in mice", PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (20081112), vol. 6, pages 930 - 940, XP002598510 | [YP] - GARTEN RJ ET AL., INFLUENZA A VIRUS (A/CALIFORNIA/04/2009(H1N1)) SEGMENT 4 HEMAGGLUTININ (HA) GENE, (20090427), XP008141566 | [ ] - NCBI, Database accession no. FJ966082.1 | [A] - CHARLAND N ET AL., "An innovative VLP-based technology to respond to global influenza vaccine needs", POSTER ABSTRACT, IDSA SEASONAL AND PANDEMIC INFLUENZA MEETING, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA, USA, (20080518), XP008128038 | [A] - SHOJI Y ET AL., "Plant-expressed HA as a seasonal influenza vaccine candidate", VACCINE, (200806), vol. 26, pages 2930 - 2934, XP022666969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2008.03.045 |