EP2298007 - METHOD OF ESTABLISHING SLEEP MODE OPERATION FOR BROADBAND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No.1, Dusing Road 1 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu City, Taiwan 300 / TW | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-chu City, Taiwan 300 / CN | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Mediatek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-chu City, Taiwan 300 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Chung-Hsien No.42 Wunchang 3rd St. Beitun District Taichung City Taiwan 406 / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Yih-Shen No.21 Alley 32 Lane 121 Sec. 3 Jhonghua Rd. Hsinchu City Taiwan 300 / TW | [2017/42] |
Former [2017/36] | 01 /
HSU, Chung-Hsien No.42 Wunchang 3rd St. Beitun District Taichung City Taiwan 406 / CN | ||
02 /
CHEN, Yih-Shen No.21 Alley 32 Lane 121 Sec. 3 Jhonghua Rd. Hsinchu City Taiwan 300 / CN | |||
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
HSU, Chung-Hsien No.42 Wunchang 3rd St. Beitun District Taichung City Taiwan 406 / CN | ||
02 /
CHEN, Yih-Shen No.21 Alley 32 Lane 121 Sec. 3 Jhonghua Rd. Hsinchu City Taiwan 300 / CN | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2011/12] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstraße 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09793847.6 | 07.07.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009CN72676 | Priority number, date | US20080078523P | 07.07.2008 Original published format: US 78523 P | US20090459711 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: US 459711 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010003372 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298007 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2298007 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2298007 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
H04W52/0232 (EP,CN,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | H04W52/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG DES SCHLAFMODUSBETRIEBS FÜR DRAHTLOSE BREITBANDKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2011/12] | English: | METHOD OF ESTABLISHING SLEEP MODE OPERATION FOR BROADBAND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2011/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE FONCTIONNEMENT EN MODE SOMMEIL POUR SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL À LARGE BANDE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.09.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1197101 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,13-18,22 * paragraphs [0002] - [0023] * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0037] * [A] 6-12,19-21 [I] 4; | [XAI]US2007218939 (LIM HYOUNG-KYU [KR], et al) [X] 1-10,12,16-21 * paragraphs [0012] - [0050] * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0059] - [0132] * [A] 14 [I] 11,13,15,22; | [XAI]US2008075026 (SON YEONG-MOON [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,16,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0007] - [0045] * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0056] - [0118] * [A] 4,11-15,22[I] 3,5,9,10,18,21; | [XAI]WO2008060033 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [X] 1,6-10,12,13,15,16,19-22 * paragraphs [0008] - [0038] * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0076] * [A] 2-5,17,18 [I] 11,14 | International search | [A]WO0200000 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD. ET AL.); | [A]WO2006036047 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [X]CN101026837 (BEIJING POSTSAND TELECOMM UNIV [CN]) | by applicant | EP1197101 | US2007218939 | US7289804 | US2008009328 | US2008075026 | WO2008060033 |