EP2298723 - PRACTICAL METHOD FOR REDUCING ESTERS OR LACTONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | For all designated states Central Glass Company, Limited 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKARIYA, Takao c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookoyama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Masato c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 03 /
SHIBASHI, Akira c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 04 /
OOTSUKA, Takashi c/o Chemical Res. Center of Central Glass Co., Ltd. 2805, Imafukunakadai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1151 / JP | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09794329.4 | 26.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009JP61682 | Priority number, date | JP20080177857 | 08.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008177857 | JP20090150401 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009150401 | [2011/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010004883 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298723 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/149, C07C31/20, C07C31/38, C07C33/22, C07C33/26, C07B61/00, C07B31/00 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
C07C29/149 (EP,US);
C07B31/00 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C31/20 (US,EP);
C07C29/149, C07C31/38 (EP,US);
C07C29/149, C07C33/22 (US,EP);
C07C29/149, C07C33/26 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/12] | C07C29/149, C07C31/20, C07C31/38, C07C33/22, C07C33/26, C07B61/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | PRAKTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON ESTERN ODER LACTONEN | [2011/12] | English: | PRACTICAL METHOD FOR REDUCING ESTERS OR LACTONES | [2011/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PRATIQUE DE RÉDUCTION D'ESTERS OU LACTONES | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2010 | Translation filed | 08.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 14.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004300131 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]WO2006106483 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * examples 1, 2 * * tables 1-4 * * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]EP1741693 (INST NAGOYA IND SCIENCE RES [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * formula (5) *; page 12 * * example 42 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]US2008071121 (SAUDAN LIONEL [CH], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * examples 1, 2 * * tables 1-4 * * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]WO2008065588 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * examples 1-5 * * tables 1-5 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y] - JING ZHANG ET AL, "Efficient Homogeneous Catalytic Hydrogenation of Esters to Alcohols", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20060206), vol. 45, no. 7, doi:10.1002/anie.200503771, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 1113 - 1115, XP055016953 [Y] 1-6 * scheme 1 *; page 1113 * * page 1114; table 1 * * scheme 2 *; page 1115 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200503771 | [Y] - MATTHEW L. CLARKE ET AL, "Hydrogenation of Aldehydes, Esters, Imines, and Ketones Catalyzed by a Ruthenium Complex of a Chiral Tridentate Ligand", ORGANOMETALLICS, (200701), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1021/om060673b, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 16 - 19, XP055106879 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 16; figure 1 * * schemes 2-3 *; page 17; table 1 * * schemes 4-6 *; pages 18-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om060673b | [YD] - ITO M ET AL, "Hydrogenation of Aromatic Ketones Catalyzed by (eta5-C5(CH3)5)Ru Complexes Bearing Primary Amines", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (200101), vol. 20, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 379 - 381, XP002451455 [YD] 1-6 * abstract * * scheme 1 *; page 380 * * page 380; table 1 * * page 381; figure 1; table 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2004509087 (FIRMENICH S.A.); | [Y]WO2005092825 (INST NAGOYA IND SCIENCE RES [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006106483 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al); | [Y] - MASATO ITO ET AL., "Hydrogenation of Aromatic Ketones Catalyzed by (eta5-C5(CH3)5) Ru Complexes Bearing Primary Amines", ORGANOMETALLICS, (2001), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 379 - 381, XP002451455 | by applicant | - CHEM. COMMUN. (GREAT BRITAIN), (2007), pages 5134 - 5142 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. (GERMANY), (2007), vol. 46, pages 7473 - 7476 | - ORGANOMETALLICS (UNITED STATES OF AMERICA), (2001), vol. 20, pages 379 - 381 | - ORGANOMETALLICS (UNITED STATES OF AMERICA), (2003), vol. 22, pages 4190 - 4192 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC. (UNITED STATES OF AMERICA), (2007), vol. 129, pages 290 - 291 | - ALDRICHIMICA ACTA (UNITED STATES OF AMERICA), (2008), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 15 - 26 | - ORGANOMETALLICS (UNITED STATES OF AMERICA), (1997), vol. 16, pages 1956 - 1961 |