EP2321733 - CONVEYING INFORMATION WITH A PCI EXPRESS TAG FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1621 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGHI, Eugene 1015 Popes Valley Drive Colorado Springs CO 80919 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09794838.4 | 07.01.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009US30297 | Priority number, date | US20080171383 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: US 171383 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010005599 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321733 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/36 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
G06F13/4282 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F13/38 (KR);
G06F2213/0026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERMITTLUNG MIT PCI-EXPRESS-TAG-FELD | [2011/20] | English: | CONVEYING INFORMATION WITH A PCI EXPRESS TAG FIELD | [2011/20] | French: | TRANSPORT D'INFORMATIONS AVEC CHAMP D'ÉTIQUETTE PCI EXPRESS | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 11.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007130397 (TSU WILLIAM P [US]); | [A]US2008034147 (STUBBS ROBERT [US], et al); | [P]US2008209099 (KLOEPPNER JOHN R [US], et al) |