EP2301105 - AQUEOUS LITHIUM/AIR BATTERY CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyplus Battery Company 2431 Fifth Street, Suite B Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISCO, Steven, J. 546 Arlington Avenue Berkeley CA 94707 / US | 02 /
DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C. 910 Acalanes Road Lafayette CA 94549 / US | 03 /
NIMON, Yevgeniy, S. 10 Cross Bridge Place Danville CA 94526 / US | 04 /
PETROV, Alexei 1755 Trinity Avenue Apt. 62 Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | 05 /
PRIDATKO, Kirill 1300 Creekside Drive 214 Walnut Creek CA 94596 / US | 06 /
KATZ, Bruce D. 600 Moraga Road Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 07 /
KATZ, Bruce D 600 Moraga Road Moraga CA 94556 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/04] | 01 /
VISCO, Steven, J. 546 Arlington Avenue Berkeley CA 94707 / US | ||
02 /
DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C. 910 Acalanes Road Lafayette CA 94549 / US | |||
03 /
NIMON, Yevgeniy, S. 10 Cross Bridge Place Danville CA 94526 / US | |||
04 /
PETROV, Alexei 1755 Trinity Avenue Apt. 62 Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | |||
05 /
PRIDATKO, Kirill 1300 Creekside Drive 214 Walnut Creek CA 94596 / US | |||
06 /
KATZ, Bruce D. 600 Moraga Road Moraga, CA 94556 / US | |||
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
VISCO, Steven, J. 546 Arlington Avenue Berkeley CA 94707 / US | ||
02 /
DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C. 910 Acalanes Road Lafayette CA 94549 / US | |||
03 /
NIMON, Yevgeniy, S. 10 Cross Bridge Place Danville CA 94526 / US | |||
04 /
PETROV, Alexei 1755 Trinity Avenue Apt. 62 Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | |||
05 /
PRIDATKO, Kirill 1300 Creekside Drive 214 Walnut Creek CA 94596 / US | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09794889.7 | 12.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009US47278 | Priority number, date | US20080061972 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: US 61972 | US20080078294 | 03.07.2008 Original published format: US 78294 | US20090159786 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: US 159786 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010005686 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2301105 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/06, H01M4/02, H01M2/16, H01M4/38, H01M6/04, H01M12/04 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
H01M4/382 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (KR);
H01M50/46 (EP,US);
H01M12/02 (US);
H01M12/04 (EP,US);
H01M12/06 (KR,US);
H01M6/04 (EP,US);
H01M6/045 (EP,US);
H01M8/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | H01M12/06, H01M4/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE LITHIUM/LUFT-BATTERIEZELLEN | [2011/13] | English: | AQUEOUS LITHIUM/AIR BATTERY CELLS | [2011/13] | French: | PILES LITHIUM/AIR AQUEUSES | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XLYI]WO2007021717 (POLYPLUS BATTERY CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12-20 * figures 9A,9B,10 * [L] 3 [Y] 21 [I] ; | [Y]US3783026 (KORDESCH K) [Y] 3 * example 4 * | International search | [A]WO9828811 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0694501 (ESPAN CARBUROS METAL [ES]); | [A]EP1892780 (ROVCAL INC [US]); | [A]US6017651 (NIMON YEVGENIY S [US], et al) |