EP2324417 - MEDIA GENERATING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sceneplay, Inc. 1369 Summit Park Court El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENBERG, Ann 1369 Summit Park Court El Cerrito CA 94530 / US | 02 /
PIERNOT, Philippe 734 Loma Verde Avenue Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09795131.3 | 08.07.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009US49957 | Priority number, date | US20080079041P | 08.07.2008 Original published format: US 79041 P | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010006063 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324417 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06F7/00, G11B27/034, H04N7/16 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N21/47205 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MEDIENERZEUGUNG | [2011/21] | English: | MEDIA GENERATING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2011/21] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE MULTIMÉDIA | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 04.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005227218 (MEHTA DINESH [US], et al); | [I]US2007234214 (LOVEJOY IAN [US], et al); | [I]WO2007149575 (DACHS ERIC B [US]) | International search | [A]US2003115598 (PANTOJA WILLIAM E [US]); | [A]US2004267816 (RUSSEK DAVID J [US]); | [Y]US2006053468 (SUDOH TATSUO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006294571 (MOORE GEORGE M [US], et al); | [A]WO2007082171 (EYESPOT CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2008092047 (FEALKOFF DAVID N [US], et al) | Examination | US2006251382 |