EP2373757 - HYDROCARBON RECOVERY PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 501 Westlake Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2020/09] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 501 Westlake Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77079 / US | ||
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 4101 Winfield Road Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGUIRE, Patrick Lee 10247 Stewart Drive Eagle River AK 99577 / US | 02 /
VITTORATOS, Euthimios 201 E 16th Avenue 305 Anchorage AK 99501 / US | [2020/09] |
Former [2011/41] | 01 /
MCGUIRE, Patrick, Lee 10247 Stewart Drive Eagle River AK 99577 / US | ||
02 /
VITTORATOS, Euthimios 201 E 16th Avenue 305 Anchorage AK 99501 / US | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2014/08] | Wilson, Nicola Ann, et al BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middx TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [2011/41] | Collins, Frances Mary BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 09796267.4 | 23.12.2009 | [2020/09] | WO2009US69404 | Priority number, date | US20090193925P | 08.01.2009 Original published format: US 193925 P | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080657 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373757 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373757 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/58 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C09K8/58 (EP,US);
Y10S507/937 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHLENWASSERSTOFFFÖRDERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/41] | English: | HYDROCARBON RECOVERY PROCESS | [2011/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'HYDROCARBURES | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 21.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2019 | 10.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5910467 (BRAGG JAMES R [US]) [YD] 1-12 * column 3 - column 4 * * column 6, line 50 - line 56 *; | [Y]WO2008029124 (BP EXPLORATION OPERATING [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 3 * * page 7 - page 12, line 16 * * claims 1-14 *; | [A] - MCGUIRE P L ET AL, "Low Salinity Oil Recovery: An Exciting New EOR Opportunity for Alaska's North Slope", SPE WESTERN REGIONAL MEETING, XX, XX, (20050330), no. 93903, pages 1 - 15, XP002393783 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |