EP2382588 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING DISPUTE RESOLUTION FOR ELECTRONIC PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verifi, Inc. 8391 Beverly Boulevard, 310 Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATZ, Matthew C/o Verifi Inc. 8391 Beverly Boulevard, 310 Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | 02 /
CAPOCCIA, Cory c/o Verifi Inc. 8391 Beverly Boulevard, 310 Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09796884.6 | 09.12.2009 | WO2009US67385 | Priority number, date | US20080343195 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: US 343195 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010074978 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382588 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/10, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40, G06Q40/02 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/389 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (EP,US);
G06Q20/405 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/19] | G06Q10/00, G06F15/16, G06Q20/00, G07F19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/44] | G06Q10/00, G06F15/16, G06Q20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWÄHRLEISTUNG VON DISPUTAUFLÖSUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE BEZAHLUNGSTRANSAKTIONEN | [2011/44] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING DISPUTE RESOLUTION FOR ELECTRONIC PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS | [2011/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À FOURNIR UNE RÉSOLUTION DE CONFLIT POUR DES TRANSACTIONS DE PAIEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 31.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 05.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0201523 (ACTIPAY LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, line 1 - line 13 * * page 5, line 19 - line 26 * * page 10, line 1 - line 5 * * page 13, line 21 * * page 15, line 23 - line 25 * * abstract * [I] 3-5,8-10; | [I]US2003233292 (RICHEY DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [I]US2008140582 (BURCHETTA JAMES D [US], et al) [I] 1-10* abstract * | International search | [Y]US2006149671 (NIX ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-10* , see entire document. *; | [Y]US2006259427 (RANDELL WAYNE L [CA], et al) [Y] 1-10 * , see entire document. * |