EP2350604 - SAMPLE COLLECTOR AND SAMPLE COLLECTING DEVICE FOR AN ANALYSIS DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEER, Sebastian Franziskanerstr. 16 81669 München / DE | 02 /
ZIEMANN, Thomas Längenthaler Str. 9 84416 Inning am Holz / DE | 03 /
MARTIN, Ulrich Prinz-Otto-Str. 21b 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 04 /
LEGNER, Wolfgang Buchenstr. 2 85635 Höhenkirchen-Siegertsbrunn / DE | 05 /
KESSLER, Matthias Schwanberger Strasse 57 89073 Ulm / DE | [2011/41] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
BEER, Sebastian Franziskanerstr. 16 81669 München / DE | ||
02 /
ZIEMANN, Thomas Längenthaler Str. 9 84416 Inning am Holz / DE | |||
03 /
MARTIN, Ulrich Prinz-Otto-Str. 21b 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | |||
04 /
LEGNER, Wolfgang Buchenstr. 2 85635 Höhenkirchen-Siegertsbrunn / DE | |||
05 /
KESSLER, Matthias Werinher Str. 16 81541 München / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/31] | Meel, Thomas EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung DSLAIP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09796984.4 | 24.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP65719 | Priority number, date | DE20081059112 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008059112 | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010060899 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350604 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/02 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
G01N1/02 (EP,US);
G01N2001/007 (EP,US);
G01N2001/022 (EP,US);
G01N2001/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | PROBENSAMMLER UND PROBENSAMMELEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ANALYSEEINRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2011/31] | English: | SAMPLE COLLECTOR AND SAMPLE COLLECTING DEVICE FOR AN ANALYSIS DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2011/31] | French: | COLLECTEUR D'ÉCHANTILLONS ET DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE D'ÉCHANTILLONS POUR DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CE DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 29.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2280133 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 22 - line 35 * * page 6, line 8 - line 18 *; | [X]FR2708740 (PROENGIN [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5571976 (DROLET GERALD [CA]) [A] 1,10,19* abstract *; | [X]US5988002 (DANYLEWYCH-MAY LUDMILA [CA], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 59 *; | [X]WO0104635 (BLOOM LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * figures 8,12-15 * * page 12, line 1 - line 2 * * page 12, line 13 - line 23 *; | [X]EP1191323 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US6572825 (LINKER KEVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 61 * * column 4, line 58 - line 59 * * column 5, line 16 - line 45 * |