EP2358550 - HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING UNIT FOR MOTOR- VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTIELLO, Fabrizio c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 02 /
STORGATO, Angelo c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 03 /
VICARI, Chiara c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 04 /
CHIABOTTO, Giuseppe c/o Iveco S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10156 Torino / IT | 05 /
SARCOLI, Alessio c/o Iveco S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10156 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
MATTIELLO, Fabrizio c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | ||
02 /
STORGATO, Angelo c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
03 /
VICARI, Chiara c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
04 /
CHIABOTTO, Giuseppe c/o Iveco S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10156 Torino / IT | |||
05 /
SARCOLI, Alessio c/o Iveco S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10156 Torino / IT | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2011/34] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09797165.9 | 03.12.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009IB55485 | Priority number, date | IT2008TO00937 | 16.12.2008 Original published format: IT TO20080937 | [2011/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010070514 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358550 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2358550 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
B60H1/00685 (EP,US);
B60H1/00857 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZUNGS- UND KLIMAANALGE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2012/52] | English: | HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING UNIT FOR MOTOR- VEHICLES | [2011/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE CLIMATISATION POUR VÉHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/34] | HEIZ- UND KLIMAEINHEIT FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | ||
Former [2011/34] | UNITÉ DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR POUR VÉHICULES À MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2009 | AT | 05.06.2013 | BE | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | GB | 03.12.2013 | IE | 03.12.2013 | LU | 03.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
GB | 03.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
GB | 03.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
GB | 03.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
GB | 03.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
GB | 03.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
GB | 03.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2634669 (GREENMUN LEO S) [Y] 3-5* column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE3330951 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 32; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE19518280 (VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]) [X] 1-2,6 * page 3, line 61 - page 5, line 33; figures 1-12 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]DE19811189 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 3,5 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-3,8,10,11 *; | [XY]WO2004078497 (HALLA CLIMATE CONTROL CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-2,6 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 9; figure 1 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 2; figure 6 * * page 13, line 11 - page 16, line 5; figures 17-21 * [Y] 3-5 |