EP2294858 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hart Communication Foundation 9390 Research Blvd.,Suite I-350 Austin, TX 78759 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRATT, Wallace, A. P.O.Box 939 Pflugerville TX 78691 / US | 02 /
MIDDLETON, Chuck 21513 Surrey Lane Lago Vista Texas 78645 / US | 03 /
OKAMURA, Mark 11106 Crossland Drive Austin Texas 78726 / US | 04 /
HATHIRAM, Daraius 9505 Tobina Lane Austin Texas 78759 / US | 05 /
HAM, Ronald, E. 5611 Muster Court Austin, Texas 78731 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
PRATT, Wallace, A. P.O.Box 939 Pflugerville TX 78691 / US | ||
02 /
MIDDLETON, Chuck 21513 Surrey Lane Lago Vista Texas 78645 / US | |||
03 /
OKAMURA, Mark 11106 Crossland Drive Austin Texas 78726 / US | |||
04 /
HATHIRAM, Daraius 9505 Tobina Lane Austin Texas 78759 / US | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09798505.5 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US48342 | Priority number, date | US20080074954 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: US 74954 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010008867 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2294858 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02, H04W24/02 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | ANALYSEGERÄT FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2011/12] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK ANALYZER | [2011/11] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2011/11] |
Former [2011/11] | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR MULTIDIREKTIONALEN SCHLEIMHAUTVERABREICHUNG UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1398909 (TEKTRONIX INT SALES GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0013] *; | [XI]US2006002331 (BHAGWAT PRAVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0038] , [0039] , [0058] * [I] 2-9,11-16 | International search | [A]US2004095951 (PARK WON-HYOUNG [KR]); | [A]US2008120676 (MORAD AMIR [IL], et al) |