EP2370814 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING ALLERGIC REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139-4307 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139-4307 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVE, Christopher, J. 227 Summer Street Unit 2 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 02 /
HAN, Qing 134 Thorndike Street Cambridge MA 02141 / US | 03 /
TRIPURANENI, Vinay 106 Forest Oaks Dr Durham NC 27705 / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
LOVE, Christopher, J. 227 Summer Street Unit 2 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | ||
02 /
HAN, Qing 134 Thorndike Street Cambridge MA 02141 / US | |||
03 /
TRIPURANENI, Vinay 910 East Windsor Fresno CA 93720 / US | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Ireland, Jacqueline Frances Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street GB-London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09799214.3 | 04.12.2009 | WO2009US66876 | Priority number, date | US20080120033P | 04.12.2008 Original published format: US 120033 P | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010065929 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2370814 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2370814 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/6863 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (KR);
C07K16/24 (KR);
G01N33/5047 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE ALLERGISCHER REAKTIONEN | [2011/40] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING ALLERGIC REACTIONS | [2011/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE RÉACTIONS ALLERGIQUES | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 21.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2009 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | LU | 04.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.12.2009 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03035824 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL], et al) [A] 1-39 * claims *; | [XYI]WO2007035633 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,16,18,19,21 * page 7 - page 28 * [Y] 17,24-39 [I] 2,6-15,20,22,23; | [XYI] - BRADSHAW E M ET AL, "Concurrent detection of secreted products from human lymphocytes by microengraving: Cytokines and antigen-reactive antibodies", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.CLIM.2008.06.009, vol. 129, no. 1, ISSN 1521-6616, (20081001), pages 10 - 18, (20080912), XP025408483 [X] 1-16,18-23 * p. 10-12, 17 * [Y] 17,24-37 [I] 38,39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clim.2008.06.009 | [XY] - LOVE J C ET AL, "A microengraving method for rapid selection of single cells producing antigen-specific antibodies", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NBT1210, vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 1087-0156, (20060601), pages 703 - 707, (20060514), XP002546224 [X] 1-16,18-23 * page 703 - page 706 * [Y] 17,24-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1210 | [XPYI] - KENT S ET AL, "OR.39. Enumeration and Phenotype of Autoreactive B Cells in Pancreatic Draining Lymph Nodes from Type 1 Diabetes Subjects", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.CLIM.2009.03.051, vol. 131, ISSN 1521-6616, (20090101), page S19, (20090101), XP026084446 [XP] 1-5,7,9,11-13,16,18,19,21 * abstract * [Y] 38,39 [I] 6,8,10,15,17,20,22-37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clim.2009.03.051 | [XPY] - HARRIMAN W D ET AL, Antibody discovery via multiplexed single cell characterization, JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JIM.2008.11.009, PAGE(S) 135 - 145, (20090228), ISSN 0022-1759, XP025913979 [XP] 1-37 * the whole document * [Y] 38,39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2008.11.009 | by applicant | US6180239 | US6776094 | WO2007035633 | - LARCHE ET AL., NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 6, pages 761 - 771 | - ROMAGNANI, S., JALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 113, pages 395 - 400 | - KAY, AB, NENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 344, pages 109 - 113 | - KAY, AB, N ENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 344, pages 30 - 37 | - BACCHETTA ET AL., JALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2007), vol. 120, pages 227 - 235 | - LARCHE, M., CHEST, (2007), vol. 132, pages 1007 - 1014 | - MEILER, F, ALLERGY, (2008), vol. 63, pages 1455 - 1463 | - KAY, AB, N ENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 344, pages 109 - 113 | - STOCKINGER, B, IMMUNOL CELL BIOL, (2007), vol. 85, pages 83 - 84 | - HOLGATE, ST; POLOSA, R, NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 8, pages 218 - 230 | - AKDIS, M ET AL., JEXP MED, (2004), vol. 199, pages 1567 - 1575 | - SIMS; CE; ALLBRITTON, NL, LAB CHIP, (2007), vol. 7, pages 423 - 440 | - WOODS ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, pages 600 - 602 | - FINK ET AL., EXP TOXICOL PATHOL, (2006), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 25 - 29 | - BODEY, B, EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 371 - 393 | - CZERKINSKY ET AL., J LMMUNOL METHODS, (1983), vol. 65, pages 109 - 121 | - PERFETTO ET AL., NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 4, pages 648 - 655 | - NAGRATH ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 450, pages 1235 - 1239 | - ZHENG ET AL., J CHROMATOGR A, (2007), vol. 1162, pages 154 - 161 | - TALASAZ ET AL., CONFPROC IEEE ENG MED BIOL SOC, (2006), vol. 1, pages 1838 - 1841 | - KRAEFT ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 10, pages 3020 - 3028 | - KRIVACIC ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A, (2004), vol. 101, pages 10501 - 10504 | - SIMS, CE; ALLBRITTON, NL, LAB CHIP, (2007), vol. 7, pages 423 - 440 | - LOVE ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2006), vol. 24, pages 703 - 707 | - BRADSHAW ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 129, pages 10 - 18 | - PANTALEO; HARARI, NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 6, pages 417 - 423 | - SEDER, NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 8, pages 247 - 258 | - HENN ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2009), vol. 183, pages 3177 - 3187 | - KANNANGANAT ET AL., J VIROL, (2007), vol. 81, pages 8468 - 8476 | - DARRAH ET AL., NAT MED, (2007), vol. 13, pages 843 - 850 | - MANZ ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1921 - 1925 | - POWELL; WEAVER, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 333 - 337 | - FRYKMAN; SRIENC, BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (1998), vol. 59, pages 214 - 226 | - OGUNNIYI ET AL., NAT PROTOC, (2009), vol. 4, pages 767 - 782 | - DECKER, EL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, pages 911 - 921 | - PENIX ET AL., JEXP MED, (1993), vol. 178, pages 1483 - 1496 | - FRYKMAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, vol. 59, pages 214 - 226 | - SCHWEITZER ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 359 - 365 | - JU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 19635 - 19640 | - SEO ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 5926 - 5931 | - JU ET AL., PROC AFALL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 19635 - 19640 | - BI ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (2006), vol. 128, pages 2542 - 2543 | US20080057371 |