EP2384557 - UNIDIRECTIONAL ABSOLUTE OPTICAL ATTENUATION MEASUREMENT WITH OTDR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Connectivity Belgium BVBA Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [2017/30] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Raychem BVBA Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAEMS, Daniel Francois DeDreef van Zonnebos 10 B-2970 s' Gravenwezel / BE | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 09799696.1 | 10.12.2009 | WO2009GB51679 | Priority number, date | GB20080023688 | 31.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0823688 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010076567 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384557 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
H04B10/071 (EP,KR,US);
G01M11/3136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MESSUNG UNIDIREKTIONALER ABSOLUTER OPTISCHER DÄMPFUNG MIT OTDR | [2011/45] | English: | UNIDIRECTIONAL ABSOLUTE OPTICAL ATTENUATION MEASUREMENT WITH OTDR | [2011/45] | French: | MESURE D'ATTÉNUATION OPTIQUE ABSOLUE UNIDIRECTIONNELLE PAR RÉFLECTOMÈTRE OPTIQUE DANS LE DOMAINE TEMPOREL (OTDR) | [2011/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/51] | 19.08.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2019 | 09.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees ES, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 02.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 02.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9006498 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1,3,6-9,11,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 22 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, lines 23-31 * * page 7, lines 22-35 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 17 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2,4,5,10,13,14; | [X]US2005105902 (ALAVIE TINO [US], et al) [X] 12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003026529 (DURKIN MICHAEL KEVAN [GB], et al) [X] 12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007166040 (JANG KI-WAN [KR], et al) [X] 12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US7454143 (WU XUEHUA [US], et al) [X] 12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1578038 (MULTITEL [BE]) [A] 1-11,13,14 * the whole document * | [XA] - YUKSEL K ET AL, "Optical layer monitoring in Passive Optical Networks (PONs): A review", TRANSPARENT OPTICAL NETWORKS, 2008. ICTON 2008. 10TH ANNIVERSARY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080622), ISBN 978-1-4244-2625-6, pages 92 - 98, XP031306064 [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11,13,14 | [XA] - MOHAMMAD SYUHAIMI AB-RAHMAN ET AL, "The overview of fiber fault localization technology in TDM-PON network", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, 2008. ICED 2008. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081201), ISBN 978-1-4244-2315-6, pages 1 - 8, XP031426097 [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11,13,14 | Examination | DE4328484 | by applicant | EP1578039 | US5991479 |