EP2382626 - SELECTIVE SCALING MASK COMPUTATION BASED ON PEAK DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHLEY, James, P. 1816 Arabian Avenue Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 02 /
MITTAL, Udar 475 Olive Street Hoffman Estates, IL 60194 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2013/38] |
Former [2011/44] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09799784.5 | 03.12.2009 | WO2009US66627 | Priority number, date | US20080345096 | 29.12.2008 Original published format: US 345096 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010077557 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382626 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382626 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/24 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G10L19/24 (EP,BR,US);
G10L19/005 (KR);
G10L19/008 (KR);
G10L19/18 (KR);
H03M7/30 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | G10L19/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE SKALIERUNGSMASKENBERECHNUNG AUF DER BASIS VON SPITZENDETEKTION | [2011/44] | English: | SELECTIVE SCALING MASK COMPUTATION BASED ON PEAK DETECTION | [2011/44] | French: | CALCUL DE MASQUE DE PONDÉRATION SÉLECTIVE SUR LA BASE D'UNE DÉTECTION DES PICS | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2009 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | HR | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MK | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | SM | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | IE | 03.12.2013 | LU | 03.12.2013 | NO | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 18.09.2013 | ||
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MK | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MK | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 18.09.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 18.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A] - RAMPRASHAD S A, "A two stage hybrid embedded speech/audio coding structure", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-4428-0, pages 337 - 340, XP010279163 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 337, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 337, column R, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 338, column R, paragraph 5 - page 339, column L, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674436 | [A] - KYUNG TAE KIM ET AL, "A new bandwidth scalable wideband speech/audio coder", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020513), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7402-7, pages I - 657, XP010804907 [A] 1,7,11 * abstract * * page 657, paragraph [2. Overview of proposed coder] * * page 659, paragraph [3.2. Auditory masking model] * * figures 1,3 * | [A] - KOVESI B ET AL, "A scalable speech and audio coding scheme with continuous bitrate flexibility", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP ' 04). IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA 17-21 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040517), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8484-2, pages 273 - 276, XP010717618 [A] 1,7,11 * abstract * * page 275, paragraph [5. A scalable CELP-TDAC codec] * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1325975 |