EP2313024 - POROUS SILICATE-CERAMIC BODY, DENTAL RESTORATION AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/17] | POROUS, SILICATE, CERAMIC BODY, DENTAL RESTORATION AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2019/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIEL, Norbert Schweizerblick 25 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 02 /
DORN, Michael Blumenstetterstraße 60 72393 Burladingen / DE | 03 /
BIBUS, Joachim Ludwig-Herr-Straße 6 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 04 /
GESKE, Vilma Feldbergstrasse 31 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 05 /
THOLEY, Michael Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 06 /
BOJEMÜLLER, Enno Ludwig-Herr-Straße 37 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 07 /
HUBER, Birgit Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2011/24] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
THIEL, Norbert Schweizerblick 25 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | ||
02 /
DORN, Michael Blumenstetterstraße 60 72393 Burladingen / DE | |||
03 /
BIBUS, Joachim Ludwig-Herr-Straße 6 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | |||
04 /
GESKE, Vilma Bergseestraße 15 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | |||
05 /
THOLEY, Michael Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | |||
06 /
BOJEMÜLLER, Enno Ludwig-Herr-Straße 37 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | |||
07 /
HUBER, Birgit Spitalgasse 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2011/17] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09800047.4 | 21.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009EP59359 | Priority number, date | EP20080160834 | 21.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08160834 | WO2008EP64602 | 28.10.2008 Original published format: PCT/EP2008/064602 | EP20090156921 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09156921 | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010010087 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313024 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313024 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/20, A61C13/083, C04B35/16, C04B35/22 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C04B35/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61C13/083 (EP,KR,US);
A61C13/0003 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (US);
A61C13/20 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00836 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6022 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6026 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,US);
C04B2235/661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/00, C04B35/16, C04B38/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] |
Former [2011/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PORÖSER SILIKAT-KERAMISCHER KÖRPER, DENTALRESTAURATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2019/16] | English: | POROUS SILICATE-CERAMIC BODY, DENTAL RESTORATION AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2019/16] | French: | CORPS POREUX EN SILICATE-CÉRAMIQUE, RESTAURATION DENTAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/13] |
Former [2011/17] | PORÖSER SILIKAT-KERAMISCHER KÖRPER, DENTALRESTAURATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2011/17] | POROUS, SILICATE, CERAMIC BODY, DENTAL RESTORATION AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/17] | CORPS POREUX EN CÉRAMIQUE SILICATÉE, RESTAURATION DENTAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 19.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19184766.4 / EP3569189 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2009 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.07.2009 | |
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | EE | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6126732 (HOFMANN CARMEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 13-20 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 30 * * column 7, lines 1-10 * * column 8, lines 25-38 * * column 12, lines 19-34 * * column 14, line 56 - column 15, line 10 * * column 16, line 49 - column 17, line 16 * * column 17, line 48 - column 18, line 37 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2004121894 (BRODKIN DMITRI [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0008] , [0033] ** claims 1-3,12,16 * |